BERGERON v. HACKER et al
Plaintiff: JACOB ANDREW BERGERON
Defendant: FREEMASONS OF THE UNITED STATES, J. BRITT JOHNSON, UNKNOWN AGENTS OF THE GEORGIA BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ATLANTA FEDERAL DISTRICT COURT ALL JUDGES, J.C. HACKER, THOMAS W. THRASH and ENNUMEROUS UNKNOWN AGENTS OF THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv01864
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ATLANTA FEDERAL DISTRICT COURT ALL JUDGES, ENNUMEROUS UNKNOWN AGENTS OF THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, J.C. HACKER, J. BRITT JOHNSON, THOMAS W. THRASH, UNKNOWN AGENTS OF THE GEORGIA BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by JACOB ANDREW BERGERON.(zmc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case, by JACOB ANDREW BERGERON (zmc)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/28/2020. (adh, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/28/2020. (adh, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JACOB ANDREW BERGERON (zmc)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against ATLANTA FEDERAL DISTRICT COURT ALL JUDGES, ENNUMEROUS UNKNOWN AGENTS OF THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FREEMASONS OF THE UNITED STATES, J.C. HACKER, J. BRITT JOHNSON, THOMAS W. THRASH, UNKNOWN AGENTS OF THE GEORGIA BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by JACOB ANDREW BERGERON.(zmc) Modified event title on 7/21/2020 (znmw).
July 9, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/09/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BERGERON v. HACKER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREEMASONS OF THE UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. BRITT JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN AGENTS OF THE GEORGIA BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTA FEDERAL DISTRICT COURT ALL JUDGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. HACKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS W. THRASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENNUMEROUS UNKNOWN AGENTS OF THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB ANDREW BERGERON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?