FAY v. HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES et al
Plaintiff: Ms. CHRISTINA PATTERSON FAY and CHRISTINA PATTERSON FAY
Defendant: Ms. LEANA ELAINE STORMONT, TOWN OF WOLFEBORO, CARROLL COUNTY, NEW HAMPSHIRE, HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES and LEANA ELAINE STORMONT
Case Number: 1:2020cv01893
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by CHRISTINA PATTERSON FAY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Pre-Deployment Cooperative Agreement, #3 Exhibit Letter by Leana Stormont, #4 Exhibit January 23, 2019 Letter by Leana Stormont, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pinkus, Irving)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Town of Wolfeboro, New Hampshire's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by CHRISTINA PATTERSON FAY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Deny, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Pre-Deployment Cooperative Agreement, #5 Exhibit Wolfeboro's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit Wolfeboro Board of Selectmen, #7 Exhibit Affidavit of Chief Dean Rondeau, #8 Exhibit News Article out of New Hampshire, #9 Exhibit Google Search results for "Tina Fay Great Danes", #10 Exhibit Continuity of Operations Plan during the COVID19 Pandemic, #11 Exhibit News Article related to litigation, #12 Exhibit Blog Post by HSUS on Great Danes)(Pinkus, Irving)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES, LEANA ELAINE STORMONT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Richeimer, Gabriela)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Irving Marshall Pinkus on behalf of CHRISTINA PATTERSON FAY (Pinkus, Irving)
August 10, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the correct event (NOTICES). (zjf)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 ENTEED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CHRISTINA PATTERSON FAY (Pinkus, Irving) Modified on 8/10/2020 (zjf).
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion of Irving Marshall Pinkus for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/06/2020. (lcrcl3)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Irving Marshall Pinkus, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7432941. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CHRISTINA PATTERSON FAY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zukerberg, Paul)
July 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/17/2020, Reply Brief due by 9/23/2020. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2020. (lsj)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time and Entry of Briefing Schedule. Defendants shall respond to the First Amended Complaint no later than 08/17/2020. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss no later than 09/09/2020. Defendants shall file reply briefs in support of any pending motions no later than 09/23/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/23/2020. (lcrcl3)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and for Entry of Agreed Briefing Schedule by HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES, LEANA ELAINE STORMONT (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richeimer, Gabriela)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 Receipt on 07/22/2020 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number: 2020 CA 002781 B. (zjf)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Town of Wolfeboro, New Hampshire's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by TOWN OF WOLFEBORO, CARROLL COUNTY, NEW HAMPSHIRE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Defendant Town of Wolfeboro, New Hampshire's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Chief Dean Rondeau, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Yoder, Katherine)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES, LEANA ELAINE STORMONT (Richeimer, Gabriela)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriela Richeimer on behalf of HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES, LEANA ELAINE STORMONT (Richeimer, Gabriela)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
July 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 002781 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7332709 filed by TOWN OF WOLFEBORO, CARROLL COUNTY, NEW HAMPSHIRE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Superior Court Documents Summons, #3 Superior Court Documents Initial Order and Addendum, #4 Superior Court Documents First Amended Complaint, #5 Superior Court Documents Notice to Clerk of Removal)(Yoder, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAY v. HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. LEANA ELAINE STORMONT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF WOLFEBORO, CARROLL COUNTY, NEW HAMPSHIRE
Represented By: Katherine B. Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Gabriela Richeimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEANA ELAINE STORMONT
Represented By: Gabriela Richeimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. CHRISTINA PATTERSON FAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA PATTERSON FAY
Represented By: Paul H. Zukerberg
Represented By: Irving Marshall Pinkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?