KASIREDDY v. WOLF et al
Plaintiff: RITHVIK R. KASIREDDY
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, CHAD F. WOLF and KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv01927
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joseph F. Carilli, Jr on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Alan Burch (Carilli, Joseph)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 14, 2020. (lccjn3)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of All Defendants (Burch, Alan)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, CHAD F. WOLF, and U.S. Attorney (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
July 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7351206) filed by RITHVIK R KASIREDDY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT LIST, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #3 Exhibit EXHBIT B, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #6 Summons SUMMONS ATT GEN, #7 Summons SUMMONS_CUCCINELLI, #8 Summons SUMMONS US ATT, #9 Summons SUMMONS-WOLF)(Jeelani, Hashim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KASIREDDY v. WOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITHVIK R. KASIREDDY
Represented By: Hashim G. Jeelani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Represented By: Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F. WOLF
Represented By: Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Represented By: Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?