NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE et al v. DEVOS et al
Plaintiff: KEISHA GUYTON, LISA MINGRONE, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, ELISE MCINTOSH, PENELOPE LANTZ, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, ADRIENNE GILBY, BETH LEWIS, VILLI PREMPEH, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, WHITNEY BATTEAST, JEANNETTE DIAZ, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, DEBORAH JOHNSON, BRITTANY ALDOUS, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, MICHELE WILSON, TRACY OCONNOR, MARSHA LOPEZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, BROWARD COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, DENVER PUBLIC SCHOOLS and DEKALB COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and ELISABETH D. DEVOS
Amicus Curiae: TEXAS CENTER FOR EDUCATIONPOLICY AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS - AUSTIN, CENTER FOR LAW AND EDUCATION, ROUGHRIDER POLICY CENTER, LIBERTY JUSTICE CENTER, TEACH PLUS TEXAS, ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN TEACHERS AND SCHOOLS, PENNSYLVANIA AFFILIATE OF THE COUNCIL FOR AMERICAN PRIVATE EDUCATION, MICHIGAN ASSOCIATION OF NON-PUBLIC SCHOOLS, EUREKA CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, CALIFORNIA POLICY CENTER, MACKINAC CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY, COUNSEL FOR AMERICAN PRIVATE EDUCATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CHICANA AND CHICANO STUDIES, WASHINGTON FEDERATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS, SCHOOL CHOICE WISCONSIN ACTION, SCHOOL SUPERINTENDENTS ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON POLICY CENTER, TEXAS ASSOCIATION FOR CHICANOS IN HIGHER EDUCATION, IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST, COUNSEL OF ISLAMIC SCHOOLS IN NORTH AMERICA, KIRKWOOD INSTITUTE, NEVADA POLICY RESEARCH INSTITUTE, AASA, NATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW AND EDUCATION, SAN ANTONIO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, UNIDOSUS, TEXAS ASSOCIATION FOR BILINGUAL EDUCATION, CATHOLIC CONFERENCE OF OKLAHOMA, COLORADO CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, WISCONSIN COUNSEL FOR RELIGIOUS & INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS, FAIRFAX COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, PROFESSORS OF EDUCATION, AGUDATH ISRAEL OF AMERICA, AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION, NATIONAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, PENNSYLVANIA CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF MEXICAN AMERICAN CHAMBERS OF COMMERCE, GOLDWATER INSTITUTE, MIDSOUTH ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS, NATIONAL SCHOOL BOARDS ASSOCIATION, EDUCATION TRUST - TEXAS, MEXICAN AMERICAN SCHOOL BOARD MEMBERS ASSOCIATION, COMMONWEALTH FOUNDATION FOR PUBLIC POLICY ALTERNATIVES, COLORADO ASSOCIATION OF PRIVATE SCHOOLS, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS, BREAKTHROUGH CENTRAL TEXAS, PELICAN INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY, NETWORK FOR PUBLIC INTEREST, TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ADMINISTRATORS AND SUPERINTENDENTS, INDIANA NON-PUBLIC EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, SCHOOL CHOICE WISCONSIN, MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY, SOUTHERN EDUCATION FOUNDATION, GREAT LAKES EDUCATION FOUNDATION, BUCKEYE INSTITUTE, EVERY TEXAN, MCNEIL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR ECUMENICAL LEADERSHIP, ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS INTERNATIONAL, LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS, MICHIGAN CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, TEXAS AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, WELS COMMISSION ON LUTHERAN SCHOOLS, CATHOLIC EDUCATION PARTNERS, ARISE ADELANTE, RIO GRANDE FOUNDATION, AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE, NATIONAL CATHOLIC EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN FEDERATION FOR CHILDREN, TEXAS HISPANICS ORGANIZED FOR POLITICAL EDUCATION, WISCONSIN CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, WASHINGTON STATE CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, PASTORS FOR TEXAS CHILDREN, ATLANTA PUBLIC SCHOOLS, EDCHOICE, TEXAS PRIVATE SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION, SOUTHEASTERN LEGAL FOUNDATION, INC. and AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS
Case Number: 1:2020cv01996
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich held on 09/04/2020. Page Numbers: 1-24. Date of Issuance: 10/14/2020. Court Reporter: Sara Wick, telephone number 202-354-3284. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/4/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2021.(Wick, Sara)
September 4, 2020 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the plaintiffs' #36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, considered as a motion for expedited summary judgment. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 4, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Main Document 78 replaced on 9/14/2020) (zjch, ). (Main Document 78 replaced on 9/14/2020) (zjch, ).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting plaintiffs' #36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, considered as a motion for expedited summary judgment. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 4, 2020. (lcdlf3)
September 4, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich: Motion Hearing held on 9/4/2020 re #36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by KEISHA GUYTON, MICHELE WILSON, HERBERT BROWN, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ELISE MCINTOSH, TRACY OCONNOR, DEBORAH JOHNSON, SUSAN BOOK, VILLI PREMPEH, PENELOPE LANTZ, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, LISA MINGRONE, ADRIENNE GILBY, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, WHITNEY BATTEAST, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, MARSHA LOPEZ, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, BETH LEWIS, JEANNETTE DIAZ, BRITTANY ALDOUS. Court to take motion under advisement and issue an order from chambers. Court Reporter Sara Wick. (zjch)
September 1, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Duggins-Clay on behalf of ARISE ADELANTE, EDUCATION TRUST - TEXAS, EVERY TEXAN, LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS, MEXICAN AMERICAN SCHOOL BOARD MEMBERS ASSOCIATION, PASTORS FOR TEXAS CHILDREN, TEACH PLUS TEXAS, TEXAS AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, TEXAS ASSOCIATION FOR BILINGUAL EDUCATION, TEXAS ASSOCIATION FOR CHICANOS IN HIGHER EDUCATION, TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ADMINISTRATORS AND SUPERINTENDENTS, TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF MEXICAN AMERICAN CHAMBERS OF COMMERCE, TEXAS CENTER FOR EDUCATIONPOLICY AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS - AUSTIN, TEXAS HISPANICS ORGANIZED FOR POLITICAL EDUCATION, TEXAS PRIVATE SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION (Duggins-Clay, Paige)
August 31, 2020 Filing 75 AMICUS BRIEF by CENTER FOR LAW AND EDUCATION. (zrdj)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of amicus Center for Law and Education's #69 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 31, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 31, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE on filing of motion for leave to file amicus brief by CENTER FOR LAW AND EDUCATION re #69 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus brief (Weckstein, Paul)
August 29, 2020 Filing 74 AMICUS BRIEF by SOUTHERN EDUCATION FOUNDATION. (eg)
August 29, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE OF PROPOSED ORDER RE: #69 by CENTER FOR LAW AND EDUCATION (Weckstein, Paul) Modified on 8/31/2020 (ztd).
August 29, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus brief by CENTER FOR LAW AND EDUCATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed amicus brief)(Weckstein, Paul)
August 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of amicus Southern Education Foundations #58 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 29, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting amici's #63 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kelly M. Dermody. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 29, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting amici's #68 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Neeru Gupta. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 29, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting amici's #67 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kartik S. Madiraju. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 29, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting amici's #66 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher B. Jordan. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 29, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting amici's #65 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Levin-Gesundheit. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 29, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 28, 2020 Filing 73 AMICUS BRIEF by EUREKA CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, FAIRFAX COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, SAN ANTONIO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(eg)
August 28, 2020 Filing 72 AMICUS BRIEF by ARISE ADELANTE, BREAKTHROUGH CENTRAL TEXAS, EDUCATION TRUST - TEXAS, EVERY TEXAN, LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS, MCNEIL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR ECUMENICAL LEADERSHIP, MEXICAN AMERICAN SCHOOL BOARD MEMBERS ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CHICANA AND CHICANO STUDIES, PASTORS FOR TEXAS CHILDREN, TEACH PLUS TEXAS, TEXAS AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, TEXAS ASSOCIATION FOR BILINGUAL EDUCATION, TEXAS ASSOCIATION FOR CHICANOS IN HIGHER EDUCATION, TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ADMINISTRATORS AND SUPERINTENDENTS, TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF MEXICAN AMERICAN CHAMBERS OF COMMERCE, TEXAS CENTER FOR EDUCATIONPOLICY AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS - AUSTIN, TEXAS HISPANICS ORGANIZED FOR POLITICAL EDUCATION, TEXAS PRIVATE SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION, UNIDOSUS. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(eg)
August 28, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Neeru Gupta, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7524767. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EUREKA CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, FAIRFAX COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, SAN ANTONIO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neeru Gupta, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fastiff, Eric)
August 28, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kartik S. Madiraju, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7524764. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EUREKA CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, FAIRFAX COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, SAN ANTONIO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kartik S. Madiraju, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fastiff, Eric)
August 28, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher B. Jordan, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7524747. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EUREKA CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, FAIRFAX COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, SAN ANTONIO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher B. Jordan, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fastiff, Eric)
August 28, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael Levin-Gesundheit, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7524721. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EUREKA CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, FAIRFAX COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, SAN ANTONIO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Levin-Gesundheit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fastiff, Eric)
August 28, 2020 Filing 64 REPLY to opposition to motion re #36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by BRITTANY ALDOUS, WHITNEY BATTEAST, SUSAN BOOK, BROWARD COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, HERBERT BROWN, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, DEKALB COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, JEANNETTE DIAZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ADRIENNE GILBY, KEISHA GUYTON, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PENELOPE LANTZ, BETH LEWIS, MARSHA LOPEZ, ELISE MCINTOSH, LISA MINGRONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, TRACY OCONNOR, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, VILLI PREMPEH, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHELE WILSON. (El-Khouri, Adele)
August 28, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kelly M. Dermody, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7524689. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EUREKA CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, FAIRFAX COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, SAN ANTONIO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly M. Dermody, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fastiff, Eric)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of amici Eureka City Unified School District et al.'s #62 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 28, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 28, 2020 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by EUREKA CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, FAIRFAX COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, SAN ANTONIO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit - Proposed Amicus Brief, #3 Exhibit A to Proposed Amicus Brief, #4 Exhibit B to Proposed Amicus Brief, #5 Exhibit C to Proposed Amicus Brief, #6 Exhibit D to Proposed Amicus Brief)(Fastiff, Eric)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of amici Arise Adelante et al.'s #55 Consent Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 28, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 28, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Fastiff on behalf of EUREKA CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, FAIRFAX COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, SAN ANTONIO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Fastiff, Eric)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting amici's #57 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shmuel B. Shulman. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 28, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting amici's #56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paige Duggins-Clay. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 28, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 28, 2020 Filing 60 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Southern Education Foundation (Snowden, Benjamin)
August 28, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Lee Snowden on behalf of Southern Education Foundation (Snowden, Benjamin)
August 28, 2020 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Southern Education Foundation (Attachments: #1 Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Snowden, Benjamin)
August 28, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Shmuel B. Shulman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7523826. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ARISE Adelante, Breakthrough Central Texas, EVERY TEXAN, MCNEIL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR ECUMENICAL LEADERSHIP, MEXICAN AMERICAN SCHOOL BOARD MEMBERS ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CHICANA AND CHICANO STUDIES, PASTORS FOR TEXAS CHILDREN, TEACH PLUS TEXAS, TEXAS AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, TEXAS ASSOCIATION FOR BILINGUAL EDUCATION, TEXAS ASSOCIATION FOR CHICANOS IN HIGHER EDUCATION, TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ADMINISTRATORS AND SUPERINTENDENTS, TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF MEXICAN AMERICAN CHAMBERS OF COMMERCE, TEXAS CENTER FOR EDUCATIONPOLICY AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS - AUSTIN, TEXAS HISPANICS ORGANIZED FOR POLITICAL EDUCATION, THE EDUCATION TRUST - TEXAS, THE LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS, UNIDOSUS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Shmuel B. Shulman)(Neeley, Steven)
August 28, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paige Duggins-Clay, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7523799. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ARISE Adelante, Breakthrough Central Texas, EVERY TEXAN, MCNEIL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR ECUMENICAL LEADERSHIP, MEXICAN AMERICAN SCHOOL BOARD MEMBERS ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CHICANA AND CHICANO STUDIES, PASTORS FOR TEXAS CHILDREN, TEACH PLUS TEXAS, TEXAS AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, TEXAS ASSOCIATION FOR BILINGUAL EDUCATION, TEXAS ASSOCIATION FOR CHICANOS IN HIGHER EDUCATION, TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ADMINISTRATORS AND SUPERINTENDENTS, TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF MEXICAN AMERICAN CHAMBERS OF COMMERCE, TEXAS CENTER FOR EDUCATIONPOLICY AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS - AUSTIN, TEXAS HISPANICS ORGANIZED FOR POLITICAL EDUCATION, THE EDUCATION TRUST - TEXAS, THE LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS, UNIDOSUS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paige Duggins-Clay)(Neeley, Steven)
August 28, 2020 Filing 55 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by ARISE Adelante, Breakthrough Central Texas, EVERY TEXAN, MCNEIL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR ECUMENICAL LEADERSHIP, MEXICAN AMERICAN SCHOOL BOARD MEMBERS ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CHICANA AND CHICANO STUDIES, PASTORS FOR TEXAS CHILDREN, TEACH PLUS TEXAS, TEXAS AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, TEXAS ASSOCIATION FOR BILINGUAL EDUCATION, TEXAS ASSOCIATION FOR CHICANOS IN HIGHER EDUCATION, TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ADMINISTRATORS AND SUPERINTENDENTS, TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF MEXICAN AMERICAN CHAMBERS OF COMMERCE, TEXAS CENTER FOR EDUCATIONPOLICY AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS - AUSTIN, TEXAS HISPANICS ORGANIZED FOR POLITICAL EDUCATION, THE EDUCATION TRUST - TEXAS, THE LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS, UNIDOSUS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Amicus Brief, #3 Exhibit B to Proposed Amicus Brief, #4 Exhibit C to Proposed Amicus Brief, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Neeley, Steven)
August 28, 2020 Filing 54 AMICUS BRIEF by AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE, NATIONAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL SCHOOL BOARDS ASSOCIATION, Professors of Education, in the public interest, network for public education. (Burritt, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Weckstein on behalf of CENTER FOR LAW AND EDUCATION (Weckstein, Paul)
August 28, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey William Burritt on behalf of NATIONAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE, in the public interest, NATIONAL SCHOOL BOARDS ASSOCIATION, network for public education, Professors of Education (Burritt, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Amici National Education Association et al.'s #51 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 28, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 28, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae by NATIONAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burritt, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting amici's #49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kathleen Boundy. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 28, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting amici's #48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul Weckstein. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 28, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 27, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathleen Boundy, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7517569. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR LAW AND EDUCATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of K Boundy, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bogin, Matthew)
August 27, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul Weckstein, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7517514. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by National Center for Law and Education (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Paul Weckstein)(Bogin, Matthew)
August 26, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Berg on behalf of AGUDATH ISRAEL OF AMERICA, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS, ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS INTERNATIONAL, ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN TEACHERS AND SCHOOLS, Americans for Prosperity Foundation, BUCKEYE INSTITUTE, CALIFORNIA POLICY CENTER, CATHOLIC CONFERENCE OF OKLAHOMA, CATHOLIC EDUCATION PARTNERS, COLORADO ASSOCIATION OF PRIVATE SCHOOLS, COLORADO CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, COMMONWEALTH FOUNDATION FOR PUBLIC POLICY ALTERNATIVES, COUNSEL FOR AMERICAN PRIVATE EDUCATION, COUNSEL OF ISLAMIC SCHOOLS IN NORTH AMERICA, EDCHOICE, GOLDWATER INSTITUTE, GREAT LAKES EDUCATION FOUNDATION, INDIANA NON-PUBLIC EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, KIRKWOOD INSTITUTE, LIBERTY JUSTICE CENTER, MACKINAC CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY, MICHIGAN ASSOCIATION OF NON-PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHIGAN CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, MIDSOUTH ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS, MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY, NATIONAL CATHOLIC EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, NEVADA POLICY RESEARCH INSTITUTE, PELICAN INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY, PENNSYLVANIA AFFILIATE OF THE COUNCIL FOR AMERICAN PRIVATE EDUCATION, PENNSYLVANIA CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, RIO GRANDE FOUNDATION, ROUGHRIDER POLICY CENTER, SCHOOL CHOICE WISCONSIN, SCHOOL CHOICE WISCONSIN ACTION, SOUTHEASTERN LEGAL FOUNDATION, INC., TEXAS PRIVATE SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION, THE AMERICAN FEDERATION FOR CHILDREN, WASHINGTON FEDERATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS, WASHINGTON POLICY CENTER, WASHINGTON STATE CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, WELS COMMISSION ON LUTHERAN SCHOOLS, WISCONSIN CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, WISCONSIN COUNSEL FOR RELIGIOUS & INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS (Berg, Luke)
August 25, 2020 Filing 50 AMICUS BRIEF by AGUDATH ISRAEL OF AMERICA, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS, ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS INTERNATIONAL, ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN TEACHERS AND SCHOOLS, Americans for Prosperity Foundation, BUCKEYE INSTITUTE, CALIFORNIA POLICY CENTER, CATHOLIC CONFERENCE OF OKLAHOMA, CATHOLIC EDUCATION PARTNERS, COLORADO ASSOCIATION OF PRIVATE SCHOOLS, COLORADO CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, COMMONWEALTH FOUNDATION FOR PUBLIC POLICY ALTERNATIVES, COUNSEL FOR AMERICAN PRIVATE EDUCATION, COUNSEL OF ISLAMIC SCHOOLS IN NORTH AMERICA, EDCHOICE, GOLDWATER INSTITUTE, GREAT LAKES EDUCATION FOUNDATION, INDIANA NON-PUBLIC EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, KIRKWOOD INSTITUTE, LIBERTY JUSTICE CENTER, MACKINAC CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY, MICHIGAN ASSOCIATION OF NON-PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHIGAN CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, MIDSOUTH ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS, MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY, NATIONAL CATHOLIC EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, NEVADA POLICY RESEARCH INSTITUTE, PELICAN INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY, PENNSYLVANIA AFFILIATE OF THE COUNCIL FOR AMERICAN PRIVATE EDUCATION, PENNSYLVANIA CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, RIO GRANDE FOUNDATION, ROUGHRIDER POLICY CENTER, SCHOOL CHOICE WISCONSIN, SCHOOL CHOICE WISCONSIN ACTION, TEXAS PRIVATE SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION, THE AMERICAN FEDERATION FOR CHILDREN, WASHINGTON FEDERATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS, WASHINGTON POLICY CENTER, WASHINGTON STATE CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, WELS COMMISSION ON LUTHERAN SCHOOLS, WISCONSIN CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, WISCONSIN COUNSEL FOR RELIGIOUS & INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS. (zrdj)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Amici Private School Associations' and Advocacy Groups' #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Luke N. Berg. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 25, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Amici Private School Associations' and Advocacy Groups' #44 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 25, 2020. (lcdlf3) Modified to add event title on 8/26/2020 (znmw).
August 24, 2020 Filing 46 Memorandum in opposition to re #36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ELISABETH D. DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Lane, William)
August 24, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Luke N. Berg, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7502093. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AGUDATH ISRAEL OF AMERICA, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS, ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS INTERNATIONAL, ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN TEACHERS AND SCHOOLS, Americans for Prosperity Foundation, BUCKEYE INSTITUTE, CALIFORNIA POLICY CENTER, CATHOLIC CONFERENCE OF OKLAHOMA, CATHOLIC EDUCATION PARTNERS, COLORADO ASSOCIATION OF PRIVATE SCHOOLS, COLORADO CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, COMMONWEALTH FOUNDATION FOR PUBLIC POLICY ALTERNATIVES, COUNSEL FOR AMERICAN PRIVATE EDUCATION, COUNSEL OF ISLAMIC SCHOOLS IN NORTH AMERICA, EDCHOICE, GOLDWATER INSTITUTE, GREAT LAKES EDUCATION FOUNDATION, INDIANA NON-PUBLIC EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, KIRKWOOD INSTITUTE, LIBERTY JUSTICE CENTER, MACKINAC CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY, MICHIGAN ASSOCIATION OF NON-PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHIGAN CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, MIDSOUTH ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS, MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY, NATIONAL CATHOLIC EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, NEVADA POLICY RESEARCH INSTITUTE, PELICAN INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY, PENNSYLVANIA AFFILIATE OF THE COUNCIL FOR AMERICAN PRIVATE EDUCATION, PENNSYLVANIA CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, RIO GRANDE FOUNDATION, ROUGHRIDER POLICY CENTER, SCHOOL CHOICE WISCONSIN, SCHOOL CHOICE WISCONSIN ACTION, SOUTHEASTERN LEGAL FOUNDATION, INC., TEXAS PRIVATE SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION, THE AMERICAN FEDERATION FOR CHILDREN, WASHINGTON FEDERATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS, WASHINGTON POLICY CENTER, WASHINGTON STATE CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, WELS COMMISSION ON LUTHERAN SCHOOLS, WISCONSIN CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, WISCONSIN COUNSEL FOR RELIGIOUS & INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke N. Berg, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Henry, Britain)
August 24, 2020 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by AGUDATH ISRAEL OF AMERICA, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS, ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS INTERNATIONAL, ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN TEACHERS AND SCHOOLS, Americans for Prosperity Foundation, BUCKEYE INSTITUTE, CALIFORNIA POLICY CENTER, CATHOLIC CONFERENCE OF OKLAHOMA, CATHOLIC EDUCATION PARTNERS, COLORADO ASSOCIATION OF PRIVATE SCHOOLS, COLORADO CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, COMMONWEALTH FOUNDATION FOR PUBLIC POLICY ALTERNATIVES, COUNSEL FOR AMERICAN PRIVATE EDUCATION, COUNSEL OF ISLAMIC SCHOOLS IN NORTH AMERICA, EDCHOICE, GOLDWATER INSTITUTE, GREAT LAKES EDUCATION FOUNDATION, INDIANA NON-PUBLIC EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, KIRKWOOD INSTITUTE, LIBERTY JUSTICE CENTER, MACKINAC CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY, MICHIGAN ASSOCIATION OF NON-PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHIGAN CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, MIDSOUTH ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS, MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY, NATIONAL CATHOLIC EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, NEVADA POLICY RESEARCH INSTITUTE, PELICAN INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY, PENNSYLVANIA AFFILIATE OF THE COUNCIL FOR AMERICAN PRIVATE EDUCATION, PENNSYLVANIA CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, RIO GRANDE FOUNDATION, ROUGHRIDER POLICY CENTER, SCHOOL CHOICE WISCONSIN, SCHOOL CHOICE WISCONSIN ACTION, TEXAS PRIVATE SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION, THE AMERICAN FEDERATION FOR CHILDREN, WASHINGTON FEDERATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS, WASHINGTON POLICY CENTER, WASHINGTON STATE CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, WELS COMMISSION ON LUTHERAN SCHOOLS, WISCONSIN CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, WISCONSIN COUNSEL FOR RELIGIOUS & INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief)(Henry, Britain)
August 24, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Britain Henry on behalf of NATIONAL CATHOLIC EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, AGUDATH ISRAEL OF AMERICA, COUNSEL OF ISLAMIC SCHOOLS IN NORTH AMERICA, ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS INTERNATIONAL, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS, ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN TEACHERS AND SCHOOLS, WELS COMMISSION ON LUTHERAN SCHOOLS, THE AMERICAN FEDERATION FOR CHILDREN, EDCHOICE, Americans for Prosperity Foundation, CATHOLIC EDUCATION PARTNERS, SOUTHEASTERN LEGAL FOUNDATION, INC., COLORADO CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, COLORADO ASSOCIATION OF PRIVATE SCHOOLS, INDIANA NON-PUBLIC EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, MICHIGAN CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, MICHIGAN ASSOCIATION OF NON-PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MIDSOUTH ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS, CATHOLIC CONFERENCE OF OKLAHOMA, PENNSYLVANIA CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, PENNSYLVANIA AFFILIATE OF THE COUNCIL FOR AMERICAN PRIVATE EDUCATION, TEXAS PRIVATE SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON STATE CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, WASHINGTON FEDERATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS, WISCONSIN COUNSEL FOR RELIGIOUS & INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS, WISCONSIN CATHOLIC CONFERENCE, SCHOOL CHOICE WISCONSIN ACTION, GOLDWATER INSTITUTE, CALIFORNIA POLICY CENTER, LIBERTY JUSTICE CENTER, KIRKWOOD INSTITUTE, PELICAN INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY, MACKINAC CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY, GREAT LAKES EDUCATION FOUNDATION, MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY, NEVADA POLICY RESEARCH INSTITUTE, RIO GRANDE FOUNDATION, ROUGHRIDER POLICY CENTER, BUCKEYE INSTITUTE, COMMONWEALTH FOUNDATION FOR PUBLIC POLICY ALTERNATIVES, SCHOOL CHOICE WISCONSIN, COUNSEL FOR AMERICAN PRIVATE EDUCATION, WASHINGTON POLICY CENTER (Henry, Britain)
August 17, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by William Kerwin Lane, III on behalf of All Defendants (Lane, William)
August 17, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #40 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with correct court/case information and case number. (eg)
August 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Responses due by 8/24/2020. Replies due by 8/28/2020. Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2020 at 1:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zjch)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #41 joint status report, the Court adopts the following briefing schedule: the defendant shall file, on or before August 24, 2020, an opposition to the plaintiff's motion: the plaintiffs shall file, on or before August 28, 2020, any reply. The court will hold a motions hearing on September 4, 2020 at 1:00pm. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 17, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 14, 2020 Filing 41 Joint STATUS REPORT by ELISABETH D. DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Lane, William)
August 14, 2020 Filing 40 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by William Kerwin Lane, III on behalf of All Defendants (Lane, William) Modified on 8/17/2020 (eg).
August 14, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich: Telephone Conference held on 8/14/2020. Scheduling discussed. Minute Order to follow Court Reporter Sara Wick (zjch)
August 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/17/2020 (zjch)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file, on or before August 17, 2020, a joint status report proposing a briefing and hearing schedule as discussed during the August 14, 2020 telephonic status conference. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 14, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 13, 2020 Filing 39 Joint STATUS REPORT by BRITTANY ALDOUS, WHITNEY BATTEAST, SUSAN BOOK, BROWARD COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, HERBERT BROWN, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, DEKALB COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, JEANNETTE DIAZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ADRIENNE GILBY, KEISHA GUYTON, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PENELOPE LANTZ, BETH LEWIS, MARSHA LOPEZ, ELISE MCINTOSH, LISA MINGRONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, TRACY OCONNOR, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, VILLI PREMPEH, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHELE WILSON. (Godley, Tamerlin)
August 12, 2020 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT re #36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended Declaration of Wendy Lecker by BRITTANY ALDOUS, WHITNEY BATTEAST, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, JEANNETTE DIAZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ADRIENNE GILBY, KEISHA GUYTON, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PENELOPE LANTZ, BETH LEWIS, MARSHA LOPEZ, ELISE MCINTOSH, LISA MINGRONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, TRACY OCONNOR, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, VILLI PREMPEH, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHELE WILSON. (Thoreson, David)
August 12, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamerlin J. Godley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Godley, Tamerlin) (Main Document 37 replaced on 8/12/2020) (zeg).
August 12, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/13/2020 (zjch)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court is the plaintiffs' #36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The parties are directed to confer and file, on or before August 13, 2020, a joint status report informing the Court whether the parties consent to consolidating consideration of the plaintiffs' motion with an expedited ruling on the merits. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a)(2). The parties shall also submit a proposed schedule for expedited briefing and the submission of the administrative record. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 12, 2020. (lcdlf3)
August 11, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BRITTANY ALDOUS, WHITNEY BATTEAST, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, JEANNETTE DIAZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ADRIENNE GILBY, KEISHA GUYTON, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PENELOPE LANTZ, BETH LEWIS, MARSHA LOPEZ, ELISE MCINTOSH, LISA MINGRONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, TRACY OCONNOR, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, VILLI PREMPEH, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHELE WILSON (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Lecker, #3 Declaration Broward County, #4 Declaration Bullock County, #5 Declaration Dekalb, #6 Declaration Denver Public Schools, #7 Declaration Metro Nashville, #8 Declaration NAACP, #9 Declaration Pasadena Unified, #10 Declaration Stamford, #11 Declaration Kravis, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(El-Khouri, Adele)
August 11, 2020 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ELISABETH D. DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION filed by DEBORAH JOHNSON, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, LISA MINGRONE, PENELOPE LANTZ, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, WHITNEY BATTEAST, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, KEISHA GUYTON, JEANNETTE DIAZ, ADRIENNE GILBY, MARSHA LOPEZ, TRACY OCONNOR, BETH LEWIS, VILLI PREMPEH, BRITTANY ALDOUS, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, ELISE MCINTOSH, MICHELE WILSON.(El-Khouri, Adele)
August 10, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Dunn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dunn, Katherine)
August 10, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Bischoff on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bischoff, Christine)
August 10, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Tafelski on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tafelski, Michael)
August 10, 2020 Filing 31 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Bischoff on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bischoff, Christine) Modified on 8/11/2020; refiled as Docket Entry #33 . (znmw).
August 7, 2020 Filing 30 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Tafelski on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tafelski, Michael) (Main Document 30 replaced on 8/11/2020) (znmw). Modified on 8/11/2020; refiled as Docket Entry #32 . (znmw).
August 5, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Reich Baril on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baril, Jessica)
August 5, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Levin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Levin, Jessica)
August 5, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Bacardi Jackson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Bacardi)
August 5, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #23 Affidavit, #24 Affidavit, #22 Affidavit was entered in error and was refiled by the Clerk's Office. (eg)
August 4, 2020 Filing 26 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/03/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ELISABETH D. DEVOS served on 8/3/2020; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 8/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(eg)
August 4, 2020 Filing 25 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/31/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/29/2020. (El-Khouri, Adele)
August 4, 2020 Filing 24 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING TO WILLIAM P. BARR by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE. (El-Khouri, Adele) Modified on 8/5/2020 (eg).
August 4, 2020 Filing 23 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING TO UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE. (El-Khouri, Adele) Modified on 8/5/2020 (eg).
August 4, 2020 Filing 22 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT of MAILING TO ELISABETH DEVOS by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE. (El-Khouri, Adele) Modified on 8/5/2020 (eg).
August 4, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Rubinstein on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rubinstein, Lindsey)
August 4, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by David Patrick Thoreson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thoreson, David)
August 4, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel T.S. Boyd on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Boyd, Samuel)
August 4, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Lecker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lecker, Wendy)
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Ian Kravis on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE (Kravis, Jonathan)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan I. Kravis. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 3, 2020. (lcdlf1)
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan I. Kravis, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7416511. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(El-Khouri, Adele)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 31, 2020. (lcdlf3)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David P. Thoreson. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 31, 2020. (lcdlf3)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J. Tafelski. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 31, 2020. (lcdlf3)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lindsey Rubinstein. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 31, 2020. (lcdlf3)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jessica Levin. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 31, 2020. (lcdlf3)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Wendy Lecker. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 31, 2020. (lcdlf3)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bacardi L. Jackson. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 31, 2020. (lcdlf3)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tamerlin J. Godley. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 31, 2020. (lcdlf3)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Katherine Dunn. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 31, 2020. (lcdlf3)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Samuel Boyd.Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 31, 2020. (lcdlf3)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christine Bischoff.Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 31, 2020. (lcdlf3)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jessica Reich Baril. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 31, 2020. (lcdlf3)
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ELISABETH D. DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
July 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David P. Thoreson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7370623. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRITTANY ALDOUS, WHITNEY BATTEAST, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, JEANNETTE DIAZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ADRIENNE GILBY, KEISHA GUYTON, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PENELOPE LANTZ, BETH LEWIS, MARSHA LOPEZ, ELISE MCINTOSH, LISA MINGRONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, TRACY OCONNOR, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, VILLI PREMPEH, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHELE WILSON (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(El-Khouri, Adele)
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael J. Tafelski, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7370615. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRITTANY ALDOUS, WHITNEY BATTEAST, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, JEANNETTE DIAZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ADRIENNE GILBY, KEISHA GUYTON, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PENELOPE LANTZ, BETH LEWIS, MARSHA LOPEZ, ELISE MCINTOSH, LISA MINGRONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, TRACY OCONNOR, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, VILLI PREMPEH, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHELE WILSON (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(El-Khouri, Adele)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lindsey Rubinstein, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7370604. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRITTANY ALDOUS, WHITNEY BATTEAST, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, JEANNETTE DIAZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ADRIENNE GILBY, KEISHA GUYTON, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PENELOPE LANTZ, BETH LEWIS, MARSHA LOPEZ, ELISE MCINTOSH, LISA MINGRONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, TRACY OCONNOR, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, VILLI PREMPEH, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHELE WILSON (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(El-Khouri, Adele)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jessica Levin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7370583. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRITTANY ALDOUS, WHITNEY BATTEAST, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, JEANNETTE DIAZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ADRIENNE GILBY, KEISHA GUYTON, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PENELOPE LANTZ, BETH LEWIS, MARSHA LOPEZ, ELISE MCINTOSH, LISA MINGRONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, TRACY OCONNOR, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, VILLI PREMPEH, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHELE WILSON (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(El-Khouri, Adele)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Wendy Lecker, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7370575. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRITTANY ALDOUS, WHITNEY BATTEAST, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, JEANNETTE DIAZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ADRIENNE GILBY, KEISHA GUYTON, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PENELOPE LANTZ, BETH LEWIS, MARSHA LOPEZ, ELISE MCINTOSH, LISA MINGRONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, TRACY OCONNOR, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, VILLI PREMPEH, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHELE WILSON (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(El-Khouri, Adele)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Bacardi L. Jackson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7370559. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRITTANY ALDOUS, WHITNEY BATTEAST, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, JEANNETTE DIAZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ADRIENNE GILBY, KEISHA GUYTON, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PENELOPE LANTZ, BETH LEWIS, MARSHA LOPEZ, ELISE MCINTOSH, LISA MINGRONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, TRACY OCONNOR, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, VILLI PREMPEH, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHELE WILSON (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(El-Khouri, Adele)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tamerlin J. Godley, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7370541. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRITTANY ALDOUS, WHITNEY BATTEAST, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, JEANNETTE DIAZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ADRIENNE GILBY, KEISHA GUYTON, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PENELOPE LANTZ, BETH LEWIS, MARSHA LOPEZ, ELISE MCINTOSH, LISA MINGRONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, TRACY OCONNOR, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, VILLI PREMPEH, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHELE WILSON (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(El-Khouri, Adele)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine Dunn, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7370522. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRITTANY ALDOUS, WHITNEY BATTEAST, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, JEANNETTE DIAZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ADRIENNE GILBY, KEISHA GUYTON, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PENELOPE LANTZ, BETH LEWIS, MARSHA LOPEZ, ELISE MCINTOSH, LISA MINGRONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, TRACY OCONNOR, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, VILLI PREMPEH, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHELE WILSON (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(El-Khouri, Adele)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Samuel Boyd, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7370512. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRITTANY ALDOUS, WHITNEY BATTEAST, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, JEANNETTE DIAZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ADRIENNE GILBY, KEISHA GUYTON, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PENELOPE LANTZ, BETH LEWIS, MARSHA LOPEZ, ELISE MCINTOSH, LISA MINGRONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, TRACY OCONNOR, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, VILLI PREMPEH, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHELE WILSON (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(El-Khouri, Adele)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christine Bischoff, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7370500. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRITTANY ALDOUS, WHITNEY BATTEAST, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, JEANNETTE DIAZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ADRIENNE GILBY, KEISHA GUYTON, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PENELOPE LANTZ, BETH LEWIS, MARSHA LOPEZ, ELISE MCINTOSH, LISA MINGRONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, TRACY OCONNOR, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, VILLI PREMPEH, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHELE WILSON (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(El-Khouri, Adele)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jessica Reich Baril, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7370478. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRITTANY ALDOUS, WHITNEY BATTEAST, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, JEANNETTE DIAZ, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, ADRIENNE GILBY, KEISHA GUYTON, DEBORAH JOHNSON, PENELOPE LANTZ, BETH LEWIS, MARSHA LOPEZ, ELISE MCINTOSH, LISA MINGRONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, TRACY OCONNOR, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, VILLI PREMPEH, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, MICHELE WILSON (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(El-Khouri, Adele)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adele El-Khouri on behalf of All Plaintiffs (El-Khouri, Adele)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7370212) filed by DEBORAH JOHNSON, DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT, LISA MINGRONE, PENELOPE LANTZ, PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, WHITNEY BATTEAST, STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS, KEISHA GUYTON, JEANNETTE DIAZ, ADRIENNE GILBY, MARSHA LOPEZ, TRACY OCONNOR, BETH LEWIS, VILLI PREMPEH, BRITTANY ALDOUS, ABRAHAM CAMEJO, STEPHEN ENRIGHT, SUSAN BOOK, HERBERT BROWN, ELISE MCINTOSH, MICHELE WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(El-Khouri, Adele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE et al v. DEVOS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEISHA GUYTON
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA MINGRONE
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELISE MCINTOSH
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENELOPE LANTZ
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABRAHAM CAMEJO
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIENNE GILBY
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH LEWIS
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VILLI PREMPEH
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHITNEY BATTEAST
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANNETTE DIAZ
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENVER COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH JOHNSON
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITTANY ALDOUS
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN BOOK
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERBERT BROWN
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELE WILSON
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY OCONNOR
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARSHA LOPEZ
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN ENRIGHT
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STAMFORD PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY ROMMEL-ENRIGHT
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROWARD COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENVER PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jessica Levin
Represented By: David Patrick Thoreson
Represented By: Wendy Lecker
Represented By: Lindsey Rubinstein
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Samuel T.S. Boyd
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Kravis
Represented By: Bacardi Jackson
Represented By: Jessica Reich Baril
Represented By: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: Christine Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEKALB COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Adele El-Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: William Kerwin Lane, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELISABETH D. DEVOS
Represented By: William Kerwin Lane, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TEXAS CENTER FOR EDUCATIONPOLICY AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS - AUSTIN
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTER FOR LAW AND EDUCATION
Represented By: Paul Weckstein
Represented By: Matthew B. Bogin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROUGHRIDER POLICY CENTER
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LIBERTY JUSTICE CENTER
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TEACH PLUS TEXAS
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN TEACHERS AND SCHOOLS
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PENNSYLVANIA AFFILIATE OF THE COUNCIL FOR AMERICAN PRIVATE EDUCATION
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHIGAN ASSOCIATION OF NON-PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EUREKA CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALIFORNIA POLICY CENTER
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MACKINAC CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COUNSEL FOR AMERICAN PRIVATE EDUCATION
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CHICANA AND CHICANO STUDIES
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WASHINGTON FEDERATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SCHOOL CHOICE WISCONSIN ACTION
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SCHOOL SUPERINTENDENTS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jeffrey William Burritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WASHINGTON POLICY CENTER
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TEXAS ASSOCIATION FOR CHICANOS IN HIGHER EDUCATION
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST
Represented By: Jeffrey William Burritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COUNSEL OF ISLAMIC SCHOOLS IN NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KIRKWOOD INSTITUTE
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEVADA POLICY RESEARCH INSTITUTE
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AASA
Represented By: Jeffrey William Burritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW AND EDUCATION
Represented By: Matthew B. Bogin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SAN ANTONIO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNIDOSUS
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TEXAS ASSOCIATION FOR BILINGUAL EDUCATION
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CATHOLIC CONFERENCE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COLORADO CATHOLIC CONFERENCE
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WISCONSIN COUNSEL FOR RELIGIOUS & INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FAIRFAX COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PROFESSORS OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Jeffrey William Burritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AGUDATH ISRAEL OF AMERICA
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Represented By: Jonathan S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jeffrey William Burritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PENNSYLVANIA CATHOLIC CONFERENCE
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF MEXICAN AMERICAN CHAMBERS OF COMMERCE
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GOLDWATER INSTITUTE
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MIDSOUTH ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL SCHOOL BOARDS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jeffrey William Burritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EDUCATION TRUST - TEXAS
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MEXICAN AMERICAN SCHOOL BOARD MEMBERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMMONWEALTH FOUNDATION FOR PUBLIC POLICY ALTERNATIVES
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COLORADO ASSOCIATION OF PRIVATE SCHOOLS
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BREAKTHROUGH CENTRAL TEXAS
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PELICAN INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NETWORK FOR PUBLIC INTEREST
Represented By: Jeffrey William Burritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ADMINISTRATORS AND SUPERINTENDENTS
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INDIANA NON-PUBLIC EDUCATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SCHOOL CHOICE WISCONSIN
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOUTHERN EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Represented By: Benjamin Lee Snowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GREAT LAKES EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BUCKEYE INSTITUTE
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EVERY TEXAN
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MCNEIL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR ECUMENICAL LEADERSHIP
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHIGAN CATHOLIC CONFERENCE
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TEXAS AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WELS COMMISSION ON LUTHERAN SCHOOLS
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CATHOLIC EDUCATION PARTNERS
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ARISE ADELANTE
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RIO GRANDE FOUNDATION
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE
Represented By: Jeffrey William Burritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL CATHOLIC EDUCATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN FEDERATION FOR CHILDREN
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TEXAS HISPANICS ORGANIZED FOR POLITICAL EDUCATION
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WISCONSIN CATHOLIC CONFERENCE
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WASHINGTON STATE CATHOLIC CONFERENCE
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PASTORS FOR TEXAS CHILDREN
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ATLANTA PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EDCHOICE
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TEXAS PRIVATE SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOUTHEASTERN LEGAL FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: Britain Henry
Represented By: Luke Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS
Represented By: Jeffrey William Burritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?