SHAWNEE TRIBE v. MNUCHIN et al
Plaintiff: SHAWNEE TRIBE
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR and STEVEN T. MNUCHIN
Case Number: 1:2020cv01999
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Referring Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on August 12, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-54. Date of Issuance: September 25, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/16/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2020.(wz)
September 25, 2020 Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA TELECONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on August 3, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-32. Date of Issuance: September 25, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal o r purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/16/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2020.(wz)
September 21, 2020 USCA Case Number 20-5286 for #50 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by SHAWNEE TRIBE. (zrdj)
September 16, 2020 Filing 51 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #50 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (eg)
September 16, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #48 Memorandum & Opinion, #43 Memorandum & Opinion by SHAWNEE TRIBE. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-7599113. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Thomas, Pilar)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the #48 Memorandum Opinion, the court grants Defendants' #45 Motion to Dismiss. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/10/2020. (lcapm2)
September 10, 2020 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: #45 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Please see the attached Memorandum Opinion for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/10/2020. (lcapm2)
September 4, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY to opposition to motion re #45 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DAVID BERNHARDT, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Cholera, Kuntal)
September 1, 2020 Filing 46 Memorandum in opposition to re #45 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SHAWNEE TRIBE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Thomas, Pilar)
August 27, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss by DAVID BERNHARDT, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Cholera, Kuntal)
August 27, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to Dismiss due by 8/27/2020. Opposition due by 9/1/2020. Reply due by 9/4/2020. (zjd)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER entering the briefing schedule proposed in the parties' #44 Joint Status Report. The schedule for further proceedings in this matter is as follows: (1) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is due on or before August 27, 2020; (2) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is due on or before September 1, 2020; and (3) Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition is due on or before September 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/27/2020. (lcapm2)
August 26, 2020 Filing 44 Joint STATUS REPORT by SHAWNEE TRIBE. (Thomas, Pilar)
August 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/26/2020. (zjd)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #3 Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/19/2020. (lcapm2)
August 14, 2020 Filing 42 REPLY re #40 Supplemental Memorandum Re: Reviewability filed by SHAWNEE TRIBE. (Labukas, Jonathan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE re #40 Supplemental Memorandum filed by DAVID BERNHARDT, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Cholera, Kuntal)
August 13, 2020 Filing 40 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Brief of The Shawnee Tribe Re: Reviewability filed by SHAWNEE TRIBE. (Thomas, Pilar)
August 12, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Motion Hearing held on 8/12/2020 re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Arguments heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Simmons on behalf of SHAWNEE TRIBE (Simmons, Nicole) (Main Document 39 replaced on 8/12/2020) (zeg).
August 11, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Pilar Thomas on behalf of SHAWNEE TRIBE (Thomas, Pilar) (Main Document 38 replaced on 8/12/2020) (zeg).
August 11, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset to 8/12/2020 at 03:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. The public access line will be muted and should only be used by non-participating parties. (zjd)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The hearing on Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction set for August 12, 2020, 1:00 p.m. via video-conference, is hereby rescheduled for August 12, 2020, 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/11/2020. (lcapm2)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF Nos. #35 and #36 . Attorneys Nicole Simmons and Pilar M. Thomas are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/10/2020. (lcapm1)
August 7, 2020 Filing 37 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by SHAWNEE TRIBE. (Labukas, Jonathan) Modified event title on 8/11/2020 (znmw).
August 7, 2020 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Pilar Thomas, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7439030. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SHAWNEE TRIBE (Labukas, Jonathan)
August 7, 2020 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nicole Simmons, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7439014. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SHAWNEE TRIBE (Labukas, Jonathan)
August 7, 2020 Filing 34 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to PI Motion (Justiciability) filed by DAVID BERNHARDT, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Cholera, Kuntal)
August 7, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P. Labukas on behalf of SHAWNEE TRIBE (Labukas, Jonathan)
August 3, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #31 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Pilar Thomas, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7411599. Fee Status: Fee Paid., #32 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nicole Simmons, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7411625. Fee Status: Fee Paid. was entered in error and will not be refiled. (eg)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The court erroneously admitted Attorneys Pilar M. Thomas and Nicole Simmons pro hac vice in this matter. Attorney John F. Dienelt, who sponsored the pro hac vice applications, is not an active member of this court's bar and therefore may not sponsor an attorney for pro hac vice admission. Either Mr. Dienelt must reapply for admission to this court's bar, or counsel seeking pro hac admission must seek a new sponsor. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/03/2020. (lcapm2)
August 3, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #30 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and will not be refiled. Attorney is not an active member in our court. (eg)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the Status Conference held today, August 3, 2020, the parties shall submit additional briefing on or before August 7, 2020. A hearing on Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is hereby set for August 12, 2020, 1:00 p.m. via video-conference. The courtroom deputy will circulate connection information to counsel. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. The public access line will be muted and should only be used by non-participating parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/03/2020. (lcapm2)
August 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/3/2020. Supplemental Pleadings due by 8/7/2020. Oral Argument set for 8/12/2020 at 1:00 PM via video conference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. The courtroom deputy will circulate connection information to counsel. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #31 and #32 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pilar M. Thomas and Nicole Simmons are hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/03/2020. (lcapm2)
July 31, 2020 Filing 32 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nicole Simmons, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7411625. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SHAWNEE TRIBE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A to Motion for PHV Simmons)(Dienelt, John) Modified on 8/3/2020 (eg).
July 31, 2020 Filing 31 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Pilar Thomas, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7411599. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SHAWNEE TRIBE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A to Motion for Admission PHV)(Dienelt, John) Modified on 8/3/2020 (eg).
July 31, 2020 Filing 30 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Dienelt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dienelt, John) Modified on 8/3/2020 (eg).
July 30, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
July 30, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Kuntal Virendra Cholera on behalf of All Defendants (Cholera, Kuntal) (Main Document 29 replaced on 7/31/2020) (zeg).
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on August 3, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The courtroom deputy shall circulate dial-in information to counsel. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. The public access line will be muted and should only be used by non-participating parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/30/2020. (lcapm2)
July 30, 2020 Filing 28 Case directly reassigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta as related. Judge Randolph D. Moss is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
July 29, 2020 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00290. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The motion to transfer isgranted, and this case shall be transferred to the District Court for the District ofColumbia ; dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) ; transferring case (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(zrdj)
July 28, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (Documents Terminated: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) (see document number #25 ) (sac, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 VACATED.....OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The motion to transfer is granted, and this case shall be transferred to the District Court for the District of Columbia ; transferring case ; granting #20 Motion to Transfer Case to Other District (JED1, Chambers) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.] Modified on 7/29/2020 (SEE ENTRY #27 (zrdj).
July 23, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Transfer (Re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District ) by Shawnee Tribe, The ; (Thomas, Pilar) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) by Shawnee Tribe, The ; (Thomas, Pilar) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
July 10, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: this document contains two events and that cannot be properly processed in CM/ECF; Correction: efiled Brief in Support of Motion - see 22 for entry (Re: #21 Response in Opposition to Motion, ) (sac, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 22 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District ) submitted as part of #21 by David Bernhardt, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Treasury ; (sac, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) by David Bernhardt, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Treasury ; (Cholera, Kuntal) Modified on 7/10/2020; this document contains two events and cannot be properly processed in one entry - see 22 for Brief in Support (sac, Dpty Clk). [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District by David Bernhardt, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Treasury (Cholera, Kuntal) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 7/9/2020, Replies due by 7/23/2020); denying #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; denying #15 Motion for Hearing (Re: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) (lml, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Shawnee Tribe, The (With attachments) (Thomas, Pilar) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #15 MOTION for Hearing ) by Shawnee Tribe, The ; (Thomas, Pilar) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 25, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Notice - Other); Correction: changed event (Motion for Hearing) (Re: #15 MOTION for Hearing ) (sac, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE (Re: #15 Motion for Hearing ) by David Bernhardt, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Treasury (Lynch, Jason) Modified on 6/25/2020 to change link information based on event edit (sac, Dpty Clk). [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Hearing (Re: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order) by Shawnee Tribe, The (Thomas, Pilar) Modified on 6/25/2020 to change event and create link to #3 (sac, Dpty Clk). [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nicole Simmons on behalf of Shawnee Tribe, The [Note: Attorney Nicole Simmons added to party Shawnee Tribe, The(pty:pla).] (Simmons, Nicole) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Pilar Thomas on behalf of Shawnee Tribe, The [Note: Attorney Pilar Thomas added to party Shawnee Tribe, The(pty:pla).] (Thomas, Pilar) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Doc. 8) is granted. Attorneys Pilar M. Thomas and Nicole L. Simmons may appear in this matter on behalf of the plaintiff. ; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kuntal Cholera on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party David Bernhardt(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party Steven T Mnuchin(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party United States Department of the Interior(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party United States Department of the Treasury(pty:dft).] (Cholera, Kuntal) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States Attorney's Office, The (alg, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) by Shawnee Tribe, The ; (Bigler, Gregory) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Pilar M. Thomas; Nicole L. Simmons to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2222320) by Shawnee Tribe, The (With attachments) (Bigler, Gregory) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Shawnee Tribe, The (Bigler, Gregory) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose #3 Ex Parte Mot. for TRO by David Bernhardt, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Treasury (With attachments) (Lynch, Jason) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Lynch on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Jason Lynch added to party David Bernhardt(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Lynch added to party Steven T Mnuchin(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Lynch added to party United States Department of the Interior(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Lynch added to party United States Department of the Treasury(pty:dft).] (Lynch, Jason) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (alg, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Shawnee Tribe, The (With attachments) (Bigler, Gregory) . Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 6/29/2020 (lml, Dpty Clk). [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2221807) by Shawnee Tribe, The (With attachments) (Bigler, Gregory) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Shawnee Tribe, The (Bigler, Gregory) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 7/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAWNEE TRIBE v. MNUCHIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Represented By: Kuntal Virendra Cholera
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Represented By: Kuntal Virendra Cholera
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Kuntal Virendra Cholera
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN T. MNUCHIN
Represented By: Kuntal Virendra Cholera
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWNEE TRIBE
Represented By: Pilar Thomas
Represented By: Jonathan P. Labukas
Represented By: Nicole Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?