GRIVNOW v. BOWSER et al
Plaintiff: STEPHEN K. GRIVNOW
Defendant: KAITLYN GIRARD, ERROL JOHNSON, D. SCOTT BARASH, NADINE SMITH, MURIEL BOWSER, LEWIS D. FEREBEE, DAVID PINDER and JADE FULLER
Case Number: 1:2020cv02000
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 10:1006
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on the Mayor of the District of Columbia., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. D. SCOTT BARASH served on 8/6/2020; MURIEL BOWSER served on 8/10/2020; LEWIS D. FEREBEE served on 8/6/2020; JADE FULLER served on 8/6/2020; KAITLYN GIRARD served on 8/7/2020, (SERVICE FOR DAVID PENDER IS BLURRED/NOT LEGIBLE and is not yet in the postal tracking system according to the number given.) (ztd)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to KAITLYN GIRARD, ERROL JOHNSON, DAVID PINDER, (ztd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2020: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (ztd).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(5) Issued as to D. SCOTT BARASH, MURIEL BOWSER, LEWIS D. FEREBEE, JADE FULLER, NADINE SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bowser, #2 Summons Freebee, #3 Summons Fuller, #4 Summons Smith)(ztd)
July 17, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to D. SCOTT BARASH, MURIEL BOWSER, LEWIS D. FEREBEE, JADE FULLER, KAITLYN GIRARD, ERROL JOHNSON, DAVID PINDER, NADINE SMITH,D.C Attorney and D.C. Attorney General (ztd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D. SCOTT BARASH, MURIEL BOWSER, LEWIS D. FEREBEE, JADE FULLER, KAITLYN GIRARD, ERROL JOHNSON, DAVID PINDER, NADINE SMITH (Filing fee $ 400) filed by STEPHEN K. GRIVNOW. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRIVNOW v. BOWSER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAITLYN GIRARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERROL JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. SCOTT BARASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NADINE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MURIEL BOWSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEWIS D. FEREBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID PINDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JADE FULLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN K. GRIVNOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?