MITCHELL v. JOHNSON
Petitioner: WALLACE MITCHELL
Respondent: LENNARD JOHNSON
Case Number: 1:2020cv02057
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by WALLACE MITCHELL (eg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 SHOW CAUSE (3) Issued as to LENNARD JOHNSON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General pursuant to #3 Order to Show Cause sent to the U.S. Marshals Service (zsb)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Respondent to Show Cause. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 11, 2020. (lcdlf2)
August 7, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 habeas petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to LCvR 40.5(a)(3), the Clerk of Court shall assign this action to the Honorable Dabney L. Friedrich, as related to Mitchell v. O'Donovan, No. 20-cv-1045 (DLF). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/7/20.(psu1)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WALLACE MITCHELL. (zmd) Modified on 8/7/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb).
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WALLACE MITCHELL. (zmd)
July 27, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 7/27/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MITCHELL v. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LENNARD JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WALLACE MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?