BUNCH v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: VERNON LAEL BUNCH
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv02106
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's response due by 10/26/2020. (ztg)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the government's #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioners 28 U.S.C. 2254 Motion. The government shall respond, by October 26, 2020, to petitioner's #1 Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus By a Person in State Custody. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 18, 2020. (lcbah2)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #1 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Richards, Grace)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace Bielawski Richards on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Richards, Grace)
August 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's response to petitioner's #1 Petition due by 8/26/2020. (hmc)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ORDERING the government, by August 26, 2020, to respond to petitioner's #1 Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus By a Person in State Custody. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 6, 2020. (lcbah2)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616103684.) filed by VERNON LAEL BUNCH.(zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUNCH v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Grace Bielawski Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VERNON LAEL BUNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?