FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT LABOR COMMITTEE, D.C. POLICE UNION v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Plaintiff: FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT LABOR COMMITTEE, D.C. POLICE UNION
Defendant: THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, MURIEL BOWSER and DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: 1:2020cv02130
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to opposition to motion re #9 Cross MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by MURIEL BOWSER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Disney, Pamela)
September 15, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #13 Memorandum in Opposition; emailed to dan@lawcfl.com, cc'd 7 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FYI; DO NOT REFILE. Future filings attorney signature must match login/password. (zeg, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 Memorandum in opposition to re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT LABOR COMMITTEE, D.C. POLICE UNION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCartin, Daniel)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by MURIEL BOWSER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Disney, Pamela)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Defendants' #12 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall file their reply by September 25, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/14/2020. (lcjeb2)
September 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 9/25/2020. (znbn)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to opposition to motion re #9 Cross MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT LABOR COMMITTEE, D.C. POLICE UNION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(McCartin, Daniel) (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/14/2020) (ztnr).
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #9 Cross MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT LABOR COMMITTEE, D.C. POLICE UNION. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(McCartin, Daniel) (Attachment 6 replaced on 9/14/2020) (ztnr).
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 Cross MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by MURIEL BOWSER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Disney, Pamela)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in opposition to re #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MURIEL BOWSER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Disney, Pamela)
August 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/4/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/4/2020. (znbn)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT LABOR COMMITTEE, D.C. POLICE UNION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(McCartin, Daniel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Summary Judgment by MURIEL BOWSER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Disney, Pamela)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #6 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by September 4, 2020; and 2) Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment by September 4, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/20/2020. (lcjeb3)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gavin Noyes Palmer on behalf of MURIEL BOWSER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Palmer, Gavin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela A. Disney on behalf of All Defendants (Disney, Pamela)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Summary Judgment by FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT LABOR COMMITTEE, D.C. POLICE UNION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(McCartin, Daniel)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to MURIEL BOWSER, District of Columbia Attorney General, (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7425036) filed by FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT LABOR COMMITTEE, D.C. POLICE UNION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Conti, Anthony)
August 5, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT LABOR COMMITTEE, D.C. POLICE UNION v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MURIEL BOWSER
Represented By: Gavin Noyes Palmer
Represented By: Pamela A. Disney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Gavin Noyes Palmer
Represented By: Pamela A. Disney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT LABOR COMMITTEE, D.C. POLICE UNION
Represented By: Anthony Michael Conti
Represented By: Daniel J. McCartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?