BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT v. CANADIAN NATIONAL RAILWAY et al
Plaintiff: BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT
Defendant: GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD, CANADIAN NATIONAL RAILWAY, BESSEMER AND LAKE ERIE RAILROAD, CHICAGO, CENTRAL & PACIFIC RAILROAD CO., WISCONSIN CENTRAL LTD., GRAND TRUNK CORPORATION and ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv02173
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Thomas F Hogan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Cases Consolidated. Cases 20cv2173, 20cv2543, 20cv1767 and 20cv2109 have been consolidated with 19cv3586 pursuant to Minute Order entered 09/21/2020. ALL PLEADINGS MUST BE FILED IN LEAD CASE NO. 19cv3586. THE PARTIES ARE ADVISED NOT TO ELECT TO SPREAD TEXT WHEN FILING IN ECF. (eg)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CONSOLIDATION ORDER; Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/21/2020. (See Order For Details) (hs)
September 18, 2020 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by BESSEMER AND LAKE ERIE RAILROAD, CHICAGO, CENTRAL & PACIFIC RAILROAD CO., GRAND TRUNK CORPORATION, GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD, ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY, WISCONSIN CENTRAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Munro, Donald)
August 10, 2020 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-13246. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #13 Motion to transfer and transferring case to the District of Columbia. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
August 7, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 9/17/2020 is Cancelled re #29 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (HMon) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE by Bessemer and Lake Erie Railroad, Chicago, Central & Pacific Railroad Co., Grand Trunk Corporation, Grand Trunk Western Railroad, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Wisconsin Central Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Munro, Donald) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE by Bessemer and Lake Erie Railroad, Chicago, Central & Pacific Railroad Co., Grand Trunk Corporation, Grand Trunk Western Railroad, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Wisconsin Central Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Munro, Donald) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF HEARING on #13 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay. Motion Hearing RESET for 9/17/2020 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER (1) Adjourning Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and (2) Directing Parties to Inform the Court of Related Filings. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Joseph on behalf of Grand Trunk Corporation. (Joseph, James) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING on #13 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay. Zoom Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **THE HEARING WILL TAKE PLACE VIA ZOOM. PLEASE USE THE LINK PROVIDED BY THE COURT TO JOIN THE HEARING** (HMon) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #25 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Brittany D. Parling filed by Chicago, Central & Pacific Railroad Co., Wisconsin Central Ltd., Grand Trunk Western Railroad, Grand Trunk Corporation, Bessemer and Lake Erie Railroad, Illinois Central Railroad Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Brittany D. Parling by Bessemer and Lake Erie Railroad, Chicago, Central & Pacific Railroad Co., Grand Trunk Corporation, Grand Trunk Western Railroad, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Wisconsin Central Ltd.. (Parling, Brittany) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald J. Munro on behalf of Bessemer and Lake Erie Railroad, Chicago, Central & Pacific Railroad Co., Grand Trunk Corporation, Grand Trunk Western Railroad, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Wisconsin Central Ltd.. (Munro, Donald) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Edelman on behalf of Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. (Edelman, Richard) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response re #13 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay filed by Bessemer and Lake Erie Railroad, Chicago, Central & Pacific Railroad Co., Grand Trunk Corporation, Grand Trunk Western Railroad, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Wisconsin Central Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Parling, Brittany) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1 Kennedy Declaration, #3 Exhibit A BMWED letter to A&S, #4 Exhibit B BMWED letter to Conrail, #5 Exhibit C BNSF Railway letter to BMWED, #6 Exhibit D NIRCRC & BMWED Agmt, #7 Exhibit E BMWED & NICTD Agmt, #8 Exhibit F Natl Med Board to BMWED, #9 Exhibit G Delaware & Hudson & BMWED MOA, #10 Exhibit H Soo Line & BMWED MOA, #11 Exhibit I Natl Railway Labor Conf to BLETRCD, #12 Exhibit J Carriers' Summary of Position, #13 Exhibit K What is the NRLC?, #14 Exhibit 2 Complaint TX 19-789, #15 Exhibit 3 Branon Dec Excerpts, #16 Exhibit 4 Complaint DDC 19-03586, #17 Exhibit 5 Motion to Dismiss DDC 19-03586, #18 Exhibit 6 Griffin Declaration, #19 Exhibit 7 Excerpts of RR Briefs DDC 94-2365, #20 Exhibit 8 12/1994 Hearing Transcript) (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #19 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 19 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute as to Defendant Canadian National Railway Only. Show Cause Response due by 2/24/2020. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Supplemental Brief, #13 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay and Statement in Su filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
January 20, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Supplemental Brief, #13 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay and Statement in Support Thereof by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #13 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay (amended brief per 1/16/20 Stipulation and Order) filed by Bessemer and Lake Erie Railroad, Chicago, Central & Pacific Railroad Co., Grand Trunk Corporation, Grand Trunk Western Railroad, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Wisconsin Central Ltd.. (Parling, Brittany) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER to File Amended Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued for *Bessemer and Lake Erie Railroad, Chicago, Central & Pacific Railroad Co., Grand Trunk Western Railroad, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Wisconsin Central Ltd.* (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay by Bessemer and Lake Erie Railroad, Chicago, Central & Pacific Railroad Co., Grand Trunk Corporation, Grand Trunk Western Railroad, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Wisconsin Central Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Parling, Brittany) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Wisconsin Central Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Canadian National Railway Company for Wisconsin Central Ltd.. (Parling, Brittany) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Illinois Central Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Canadian National Railway Company for Illinois Central Railroad Company. (Parling, Brittany) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Grand Trunk Western Railroad identifying Corporate Parent Canadian National Railway Company for Grand Trunk Western Railroad. (Parling, Brittany) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Grand Trunk Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Canadian National Railway Company for Grand Trunk Corporation. (Parling, Brittany) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bessemer and Lake Erie Railroad identifying Corporate Parent Canadian National Railway for Bessemer and Lake Erie Railroad. (Parling, Brittany) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Dale Parling on behalf of Bessemer and Lake Erie Railroad, Chicago, Central & Pacific Railroad Co., Grand Trunk Corporation, Grand Trunk Western Railroad, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Wisconsin Central Ltd.. (Parling, Brittany) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
January 6, 2020 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Bessemer and Lake Erie Railroad, Chicago, Central & Pacific Railroad Co., Grand Trunk Western Railroad, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Wisconsin Central Ltd.. (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Grand Trunk Corporation waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Canadian National Railway waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
November 5, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Grand Trunk Corporation* (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Canadian National Railway* (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT against Canadian National Railway, Grand Trunk Corporation. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7472644 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Cook County, IL. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT v. CANADIAN NATIONAL RAILWAY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANADIAN NATIONAL RAILWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BESSEMER AND LAKE ERIE RAILROAD
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHICAGO, CENTRAL & PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WISCONSIN CENTRAL LTD.
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAND TRUNK CORPORATION
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?