CHEEKS v. CUSHWA et al
Petitioner: DAVID CHEEKS
Respondent: LENNARD JOHNSON and PATRICIA CUSHWA
Case Number: 1:2020cv02200
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 SHOW CAUSE (4) Issued as to PATRICIA CUSHWA, LENNARD JOHNSON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General pursuant to Order to Show Cause filed on 09/14/2020 sent to the U.S. Marshals Service (zsb) (zsb).
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Government shall Show Cause by October 30, 2020, why Petitioners #1 habeas petition should not be granted. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/14/20. (znbn)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Clerk shall direct the USMS to effect service of the Summons and Complaint. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/13/2020. (lcjeb2)
August 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that #2 petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall assign this case randomly to a judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/12/20. (psu2)
August 10, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 08/10/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHEEKS v. CUSHWA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LENNARD JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PATRICIA CUSHWA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID CHEEKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?