DCA HADLEY LTAC, LLC dba BRIDGEPOINT HOSPITAL NATIONAL HARBOR v. HEALTHKEEPERS INC.
Plaintiff: DCA HADLEY LTAC, LLC dba BRIDGEPOINT HOSPITAL NATIONAL HARBOR and DCA HADLEY LTAC, LLC doing business as BRIDGEPOINT HOSPITAL NATIONAL HARBOR
Defendant: HEALTHKEEPERS INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02203
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint and Request for Oral Hearing filed by HEALTHKEEPERS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Karen W. Meyer)(Reza, Syed)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DCA HADLEY LTAC, LLC (Wong, Cyndi)
September 15, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document Nos. re #9 Reply to opposition to Motion, #10 Reply to opposition to Motion, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the correct docket event. (zjf)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint and Request for Oral Hearing Certificate Required by LCvR 7.1 of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia filed by DCA HADLEY LTAC, LLC. (Wong, Cyndi) Modified on 9/15/2020 (zjf).
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint and Request for Oral Hearing Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by DCA HADLEY LTAC, LLC. (Wong, Cyndi) Modified on 9/15/2020 (zjf).
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint and Request for Oral Hearing filed by DCA HADLEY LTAC, LLC. (Wong, Cyndi)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint and Request for Oral Hearing by HEALTHKEEPERS INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/19/20. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
August 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Complaint due by 9/1/2020. (mac)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by no later than September 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/18/2020. (lcegs2)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Receipt on 08/17/2020 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number: 2020 CA 003121 B. (zjf)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by HEALTHKEEPERS INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (zmc)
August 13, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmc)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HEALTHKEEPERS INC. (Reza, Syed)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of The District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 003121 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7450226 filed by HEALTHKEEPERS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reza, Syed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DCA HADLEY LTAC, LLC dba BRIDGEPOINT HOSPITAL NATIONAL HARBOR v. HEALTHKEEPERS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTHKEEPERS INC.
Represented By: Syed M. Reza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DCA HADLEY LTAC, LLC dba BRIDGEPOINT HOSPITAL NATIONAL HARBOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DCA HADLEY LTAC, LLC doing business as BRIDGEPOINT HOSPITAL NATIONAL HARBOR
Represented By: Cyndi K. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?