MKWANAZI v. NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.
Plaintiff: ZANDILE MKWANAZI
Defendant: NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02231
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05:7101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 Receipt on 08-19-2020 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2020 CA 002861 B. (zrdj)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.. (DeLorme, Malcom)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ZANDILE MKWANAZI. (Branch, David)
September 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motion due by 9/10/2020. (ztg)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiff's #7 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and DIRECTING plaintiff to file any opposition to defendant's #6 Motion to Dismiss by September 10, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 4, 2020. (lcbah1)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss by ZANDILE MKWANAZI (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Branch, David)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A (Collective Bargaining Agreement))(DeLorme, Malcom)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 18, 2020. (lcbcah1)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, )
August 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ERRATA (Corrected Civil Cover Sheet) by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. #1 Notice of Removal, filed by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.. (DeLorme, Malcom)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. (DeLorme, Malcom)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from D.C. Superior Court, case number 2020 CA 002861 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7460475 filed by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (State Court Pleadings), #3 Exhibit B (Notice to Plaintiff), #4 Exhibit C (Notice to State Court))(DeLorme, Malcom)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MKWANAZI v. NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.
Represented By: Malcom Carter DeLorme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZANDILE MKWANAZI
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?