P.J.E.S. v. WOLF et al
Plaintiff: P.J.E.S.
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, RODNEY S. SCOTT, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, TODD C. OWEN and MARK A. MORGAN
Petitioner: SCHOLARS OF REFUGEE AND IMMIGRATION LAW and INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT
Amicus Curiae: IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE
Case Number: 1:2020cv02245
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: G Michael Harvey
Referring Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 8:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 72 RESPONSE re #69 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by P.J.E.S.. (Gelernt, Lee)
October 6, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Ming Cheung on behalf of P.J.E.S. (Cheung, Ming)
October 4, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Michelman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Michelman, Scott)
October 2, 2020 Filing 69 OBJECTION to #65 Report and Recommendations filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF. (Lin, Jean)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for in structions. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 9/29/20. (MFB)
September 28, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ming Cheung, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7648323. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by P.J.E.S. (Perez, Celso)
September 25, 2020 Filing 68 SUPPLEMENTARY DECLARATION OF JALLYN SUALOG, DEPUTY DIRECTOR, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT re #42 RESPONSE re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP. (zjf)
September 25, 2020 Filing 65 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by P.J.E.S., #2 MOTION to Certify Class filed by P.J.E.S.. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 9/25/20. (MFB)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying #58 Motion to Strike ; granting #58 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 9/25/20. (MFB)
September 25, 2020 Filing 63 REPLY to opposition to motion re #58 MOTION to Strike #52 Reply to opposition to Motion, ECF No. 52-4 (Declaration of Mark Greenberg) MOTION for Leave to File September 17, 2020 Declaration of Jallyn Sualog filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF. (Senanayake, Tanya)
September 24, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE TO COURT CORRECTING PLAINTIFF'S AGE by P.J.E.S. re #52 Reply to opposition to Motion, (Gelernt, Lee)
September 24, 2020 Filing 61 RESPONSE re #58 MOTION to Strike #52 Reply to opposition to Motion, ECF No. 52-4 (Declaration of Mark Greenberg) MOTION for Leave to File September 17, 2020 Declaration of Jallyn Sualog and Notice Regarding Impact of Order in Flores v. Barr filed by P.J.E.S.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gelernt, Lee)
September 24, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry #59 MOTION for Leave to File (same filing as ECF No. 58) was entered in error (duplicate); Docket Entry #58 is correct as filed as to both reliefs requested. (znmw)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 SCHEDULING ORDER: Responses due by 5:00 p.m. EDT 9/24/2020 Replies due by 3:00 p.m. EDT 9/25/2020. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 9/23/20. (MFB)
September 22, 2020 Filing 59 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Leave to File (same filing as ECF No. 58) by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jallyn Sualog, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Senanayake, Tanya) Modified on 9/24/2020 (znmw).
September 22, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION to Strike #52 Reply to opposition to Motion, ECF No. 52-4 (Declaration of Mark Greenberg), MOTION for Leave to File September 17, 2020 Declaration of Jallyn Sualog by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jallyn Sualog, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Senanayake, Tanya)
September 17, 2020 Filing 57 AMICUS BRIEF by IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE. (zjf)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 9/17/20. (MFB)
September 16, 2020 Filing 56 SEALED MEMORANDUM re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and, #2 MOTION to Certify Class filed by P.J.E.S. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
September 16, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE by P.J.E.S. re #49 Scheduling Order (Gelernt, Lee)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #51 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 9/16/20. (MFB)
September 15, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY to opposition to motion re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #2 MOTION to Certify Class filed by P.J.E.S.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of P.J.E.S., #2 Declaration of Stephen B. Kang (Second), #3 Exhibit in Support of Stephen B. Kang's Second Declaration, #4 Declaration of Mark Greenberg with Exhibit)(Gelernt, Lee)
September 15, 2020 Filing 51 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by P.J.E.S. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motions for Classwide Preliminary Injunction and Class Certification)(Gelernt, Lee)
September 14, 2020 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE re #48 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected. (Miano, John)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SCHEDULING ORDER: See Order for details. Responses due by 9/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 9/14/20. (MFB)
September 14, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File by IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Miano, John)
September 13, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Miano on behalf of IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE (Miano, John) (Main Document 47 replaced on 9/14/2020) (zjf).
September 10, 2020 Filing 46 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Redacted Declaration to #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by P.J.E.S.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mario Escobar Francisco)(Gelernt, Lee)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 9/9/20. (MFB)
September 9, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey for full case management pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.2 (zmd)
September 8, 2020 Filing 44 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Lin, Jean)
September 8, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE re #2 MOTION to Certify Class filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean)
September 8, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean)
September 8, 2020 Filing 41 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW T. ALBENCE served on 8/21/2020; ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 8/21/2020; MARK A. MORGAN served on 8/21/2020; TODD C. OWEN served on 8/21/2020; ROBERT R. REDFIELD served on 8/20/2020; RODNEY S. SCOTT served on 8/21/2020; HEIDI STIRRUP served on 8/21/2020; CHAD F. WOLF served on 8/21/2020 (Perez, Celso)
September 8, 2020 Filing 40 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/21/2020. (Perez, Celso)
September 8, 2020 Filing 39 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/21/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/20/2020. (Perez, Celso)
September 8, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya D. Senanayake on behalf of All Defendants (Senanayake, Tanya)
September 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of the referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Harvey for full case management pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.2, the parties shall adhere to the following expedited briefing schedule should there be objections to the recommendations of the Magistrate Judge. Objections shall be due no later than 7 after being served with a copy thereof; oppositions shall be due no later than 7 days after being served with a copy of the objections; and replies shall be due no later than 5 days after being served with a copy of the opposition. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/6/2020. (lcegs1)
September 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER referring case to Magistrate Judge Harvey for full case management pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.2, including, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.3(a)(2), the preparation of a report and recommendation on the motion for classwide preliminary injunction and, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.3(a)(3), the motion to certify class; as well as, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.3(a)(3), any subsequent cross motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/6/2020. (lcegs1)
September 4, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Karla Vargas on behalf of P.J.E.S. (Vargas, Karla)
September 4, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariko Hirose on behalf of INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT (Hirose, Mariko)
September 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Redacted Document due by 9/8/2020. (mac)
September 3, 2020 Filing 37 AMICUS BRIEF by INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT. (zjf)
September 3, 2020 Filing 36 AMICUS BRIEF by SCHOLARS OF REFUGEE AND IMMIGRATION LAW. (zjf)
September 3, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn S. Austin on behalf of INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT (Austin, Kathryn)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #32 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Efren C. Olivares is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/3/2020. (lcegs2)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #31 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Karla M. Vargas is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/3/2020. (lcegs2)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #14 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL. Plaintiff may file his document under seal. However, given the strong presumption in favor of public access to judicial records, see, e.g., Nixon v. Warner Commc'ns, Inc., 435 U.S. 589, 597 (1978) ("It is clear that the courts of this country recognize a general right to inspect and copy public records and documents, including judicial records and documents."), and the ease with which confidential and proprietary information may be redacted from documents before they are filed publicly, Plaintiffs are directed to file a redacted version of their sealed document on the public record within five business days of this Order. Plaintiffs are cautioned that redactions shall be made solely to the extent necessary to preserve the confidential or proprietary nature of the relevant information. Further, the Court GRANTS #17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Scholars of Refugee and Immigration Law and #30 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/3/2020. (lcegs2)
September 3, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Efren C. Olivares, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7547014. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by P.J.E.S. (Perez, Celso)
September 3, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karla M. Vargas, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7546995. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by P.J.E.S. (Perez, Celso)
August 31, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Austin, Kathryn)
August 31, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie L. Crook on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Crook, Jamie)
August 31, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Matthew Snell on behalf of All Defendants (Snell, Kevin)
August 29, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of All Defendants (Lin, Jean)
August 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiffs Motions For Preliminary Injunction And Class Certification due by 9/8/2020. Plaintiff's Reply due by 9/15/2020. (mac)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #25 joint status report, in which parties indicate that the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention ("CDC") expects to issue a Final Rule, as well as an amended CDC Order, the parties SHALL limit their briefs to arguments concerning Plaintiff's motions for preliminary injunction and class certification. Parties SHALL adhere to the following briefing schedule: Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs motions for preliminary injunction and class certification shall be filed by no later than September 8, 2020, and Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed by no later than September 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/28/2020. (lcegs2)
August 27, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody H. Wofsy on behalf of P.J.E.S. (Wofsy, Cody)
August 27, 2020 Filing 25 Joint STATUS REPORT by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF. (Lin, Jean)
August 25, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah A. Levine on behalf of SCHOLARS OF REFUGEE AND IMMIGRATION LAW (Levine, Noah)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #19 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Noah A. Levine is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/24/2020. (lcegs2)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #13 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Omar Jadwat is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. However, the Court notes that this is Attorney Jadwat's fifth time being admitted pro hac vice in this court in two years. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Su llivan on 8/24/2020. (lcegs2)
August 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Cody Wofsy is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. However, the Court notes that this is Attorney Wofsy's fifth time being admitted pro hac vice in this court in two years. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sull ivan on 8/22/2020. (lcegs2)
August 21, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Antonio Galindo on behalf of P.J.E.S. (Galindo, Daniel)
August 21, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Pon Harrold on behalf of P.J.E.S. (Harrold, Adrienne)
August 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Russell on behalf of P.J.E.S. (Russell, Morgan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Bonggyun Kang on behalf of P.J.E.S. (Kang, Stephen)
August 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due no later than 12:00PM on 8/27/2020 (mac)
August 21, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Noah A. Levine, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7494939. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Scholars of Refugee and Immigration Law (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfson, Paul)
August 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul R.Q. Wolfson on behalf of Scholars of Refugee and Immigration Law (Wolfson, Paul)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #15 plaintiffs' motion for classwide preliminary injunction, plaintiffs are HEREBY DIRECTED to contact forthwith the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Columbia and/or the Department of Justice as appropriate to identify government counsel. The parties shall thereafter file a joint status report by no later than 12:00 pm on August 27, 2020 with recommendations for further proceedings, including, inter alia, (1) proposed briefing schedule for #2 Motion to Certify Class; (2) whether plaintiffs' motion for classwide preliminary injunction should be consolidated with the merits under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65; and (3) recommendations for further proceedings including, if necessary, a briefing schedule for plaintiffs' motion for classwide preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/21/2020. (lcegs1)
August 21, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Scholars of Refugee and Immigration Law (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfson, Paul)
August 21, 2020 Filing 16 ERRATA Concerning Motion for Class Certification by P.J.E.S. #2 MOTION to Certify Class filed by P.J.E.S.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Motion for Class Certification)(Gelernt, Lee)
August 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by P.J.E.S. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Index of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Declaration of Adrienne Harrold, #5 Exhibit A-H of Adrienne Harrold Declaration, #6 Declaration of Chris Palusky, #7 Declaration of Les Roberts and Stephen Patrick Kachur, #8 Exhibit CV of Les Roberts, #9 Exhibit CV of Stephen Patrick Kachur, #10 Declaration of Linda Corchado, #11 Declaration of Taylor Levy, #12 Declaration of Lisa Frydman)(Gelernt, Lee)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by P.J.E.S. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mario Francisco Escobar)(Gelernt, Lee)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Omar Jadwat, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7489893. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by P.J.E.S. (Perez, Celso)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Gelernt on behalf of P.J.E.S. (Gelernt, Lee)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Cody Wofsy, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7488178. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by P.J.E.S. (Perez, Celso)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Morgan Russell is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. However, the Court notes that this is Attorney Russell's fifth time being admitted pro hac vice in this court in two years. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/19/2020. (lcegs2)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Lee Gelernt is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. However, the Court notes that this is Attorney Gelernt's sixth time being admitted pro hac vice in this court in two years. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sul livan on 8/19/2020. (lcegs2)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Daniel Galindo is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. However, the Court notes that this is Attorney Galindo's fifth time being admitted pro hac vice in this court in two years. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/19/2020. (lcegs2)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Adrienne Harrold is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. However, the Court notes that this is Attorney Harrold's fourth time being admitted pro hac vice in this court in two years. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions Signed by Judge Emm et G. Sullivan on 8/19/2020. (lcegs2)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Stephen B. Kang is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. However, the Court notes that this is Attorney Kang's fifth time being admitted pro hac vice in this court in two years. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions Signed by Judge Emmet G. S ullivan on 8/19/2020. (lcegs2)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/19/20. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Morgan Russell, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7483673. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by P.J.E.S. (Perez, Celso)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lee Gelernt, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7483556. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by P.J.E.S. (Perez, Celso)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel Galindo, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7483442. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by P.J.E.S. (Perez, Celso)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Adrienne Harrold, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7483388. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by P.J.E.S. (Perez, Celso)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen B. Kang, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7483309. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by P.J.E.S. (Perez, Celso)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (10) Issued Electronically as to MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmc)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spitzer, Arthur)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Certify Class by P.J.E.S. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Stephen B. Kang with Exhibits, #3 Declaration of Scott Michelman, #4 Declaration of Nicholas Stefaniak)(Perez, Celso)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CDCDC-7467238) filed by P.J.E.S.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for All Defendants, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General)(Perez, Celso)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P.J.E.S. v. WOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.J.E.S.
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Adrienne Pon Harrold
Represented By: Jamie L. Crook
Represented By: Morgan Russell
Represented By: Karla Vargas
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Represented By: Daniel Antonio Galindo
Represented By: Stephen Bonggyun Kang
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Ming Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODNEY S. SCOTT
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEIDI STIRRUP
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F. WOLF
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT R. REDFIELD
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD C. OWEN
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK A. MORGAN
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SCHOLARS OF REFUGEE AND IMMIGRATION LAW
Represented By: Noah A. Levine
Represented By: Paul R.Q. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Kathryn S. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE
Represented By: John Michael Miano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?