KHAN v. POMPEO et al
Plaintiff: MOHAMMAD ATIQ KHAN and MOHAMMAD ATIF KHAN
Defendant: MIKE POMPEO, KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II, PAUL W. JONES, WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, CHAD F. WOLF, MARIK STRING, CHRISTOPHER ASHER WRAY, JOHN HOOVER and KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv02249
Filed: August 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of All Defendants (Yee, Marsha)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 ERRATA re corrected complaint by MOHAMMAD ATIQ KHAN #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, filed by MOHAMMAD ATIQ KHAN. (Goldstein, Joshua)
August 18, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #4 Errata was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading in proper pleading format. (eg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA typo re Plaintiff's middle name by MOHAMMAD ATIQ KHAN #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, filed by MOHAMMAD ATIQ KHAN. (Goldstein, Joshua) Modified on 8/18/2020 (eg).
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II, JOHN HOOVER, PAUL W. JONES, MIKE POMPEO, MARIK STRING, CHAD F. WOLF, CHRISTOPHER ASHER WRAY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 17, 2020. (lcdlf2)
August 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, )
August 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II, JOHN HOOVER, PAUL W. JONES, MIKE POMPEO, MARIK STRING, CHAD F. WOLF, CHRISTOPHER ASHER WRAY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7468715) filed by MOHAMMAD ATIQ KHAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Goldstein, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KHAN v. POMPEO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE POMPEO
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL W. JONES
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM PELHAM BARR
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F. WOLF
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIK STRING
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER ASHER WRAY
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN HOOVER
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMAD ATIQ KHAN
Represented By: Joshua L. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMAD ATIF KHAN
Represented By: Joshua L. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?