LEONARD A. SACKS & ASSOCIATES, P.C. v. INTERNATIONAL MONETARY FUND
Plaintiff: LEONARD A. SACKS & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL MONETARY FUND
Case Number: 1:2020cv02266
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James R Newland, Jr on behalf of INTERNATIONAL MONETARY FUND (Newland, James)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Immunity filed by INTERNATIONAL MONETARY FUND. (Appel, Renee)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by INTERNATIONAL MONETARY FUND. (Appel, Renee)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/2/2020. (lctjk1)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LEONARD A. SACKS & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Spence, Donald)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Immunity filed by LEONARD A. SACKS & ASSOCIATES, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spence, Donald)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by LEONARD A. SACKS & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spence, Donald)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Immunity by INTERNATIONAL MONETARY FUND (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Appel, Renee)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal. (zmd)
August 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Hart Spence, Jr on behalf of LEONARD A. SACKS & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Spence, Donald)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 000711 C Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7476193 filed by INTERNATIONAL MONETARY FUND. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Appel, Renee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEONARD A. SACKS & ASSOCIATES, P.C. v. INTERNATIONAL MONETARY FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL MONETARY FUND
Represented By: Renee Beth Appel
Represented By: James R Newland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD A. SACKS & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Represented By: Donald Hart Spence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?