PEREZ SANCHEZ v. LALIGURAS DC, LLC et al
Plaintiff: AMILCAR PEREZ SANCHEZ
Defendant: PAWAN KHADKA, DAWA TAMANG, SR. and LALIGURAS DC, LLC doing business as LALIGURAS INDIAN & NEPALI BISTRO
Case Number: 1:2020cv02275
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2020. Discovery due by 2/15/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 12/14/2020. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(1) due by 11/16/2020. Defendant Rule 26(a)(1) due by 11/16/2020. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 12/11/2020. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 1/14/2021. Summary Judgment motion due by 3/1/2021. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/15/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/22/2021. (tb)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: End of Discovery by 2/15/2021. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due 3/1/21. Plaintiff's Response due 3/15/2021. Defendant's Reply due 3/22/2021. (See order for further details including the parties' obligation to meet, confer and present jointly any discovery disputes prior to filing a motion). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/2/2020. (DJS)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Howard)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Philip Tucker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tucker, Jonathan)
September 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/1/2020. (tb)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: No later than 10/1/2020 the parties shall file their joint Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting, pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 16.3. The Report shall include a proposed Scheduling Order in the format found on Judge Chutkan's court webpage, along with any proposed changes which shall be highlighted. On the same day that the parties file their Rule 26 report and proposed Scheduling Order, the parties shall also email a Word version of the proposed order to Chambers. When proposing deadlines, the parties shall avoid proposing a schedule that contains submission of simultaneous dispositive cross-motions. In addition to the requirements under the Federal and Local Rules, the parties' report shall contain a succinct summary of the case and the statutory basis for all causes of action and defenses. Separate Reports will be stricken, sua sponte. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/15/2020. (DJS)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LALIGURAS DC, LLC (Hoffman, Howard)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by PAWAN KHADKA, LALIGURAS DC, LLC, DAWA TAMANG, SR.(Hoffman, Howard)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PAWAN KHADKA served on 8/23/2020, answer due 9/13/2020 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LALIGURAS DC, LLC served on 8/23/2020, answer due 9/13/2020 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAWA TAMANG, SR served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/12/2020 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to PAWAN KHADKA, LALIGURAS DC, LLC, DAWA TAMANG, SR. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
August 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7480707) filed by AMILCAR PEREZ SANCHEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (3))(Zelikovitz, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEREZ SANCHEZ v. LALIGURAS DC, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMILCAR PEREZ SANCHEZ
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Represented By: Jonathan Philip Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAWAN KHADKA
Represented By: Howard B. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAWA TAMANG, SR.
Represented By: Howard B. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LALIGURAS DC, LLC doing business as LALIGURAS INDIAN & NEPALI BISTRO
Represented By: Howard B. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?