MONIQUE C. DAVIS v. ANDREW M. SAUL
Plaintiff: MONIQUE C. DAVIS
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv02282
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/02/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/2/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/1/2020.) (eg)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANDREW M. SAUL served on 9/10/2020 (ztd)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, sent to the U.S. Marshals Service (adh, )
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/27/2020. (DM)
August 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall assign this case randomly to a judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/21/20. (psu2)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliott Denbo Andalman on behalf of MONIQUE C. DAVIS (Andalman, Elliott) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/31/2020) (znmw).
August 19, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/19/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONIQUE C. DAVIS v. ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONIQUE C. DAVIS
Represented By: Christine P Benagh
Represented By: Elliott Denbo Andalman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?