JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Case Number: 1:2020cv02288
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall review this Court's #5 General Order and Guidelines Applicable to FOIA Cases, and promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment, on or before 10/19/2020. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/5/2020. (jaga)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Peterson, Benton)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of All Defendants (Peterson, Benton)
September 5, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 8/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Aldrich, Jason)
September 5, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 8/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Aldrich, Jason)
September 5, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/31/20. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Aldrich, Jason)
September 5, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/31/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Aldrich, Jason)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/20/2020. (jag)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
August 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-00694-KBJ. (Aldrich, Jason)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (US Department of State and US Department of Defense) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7484041) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, #3 Summons for US Attorney General, #4 Summons for US State Department, #5 Summons for US Department of Defense)(Aldrich, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Represented By: Jason Blaine Aldrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?