OPEN THE GOVERNMENT et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: OPEN THE GOVERNMENT and GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
Case Number: 1:2020cv02290
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 12, 2020. (lcrbw3)
October 12, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/27/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/26/2020. (Burday, Joshua)
October 12, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/28/20. (Burday, Joshua)
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/27/2020 (Burday, Joshua)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION served on 8/26/2020 (Burday, Joshua)
September 25, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/23/2020 (hs)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing the filing of dispositive motions on or before October 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 25, 2020. (lcrbw3)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Powell, Amy)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Powell on behalf of All Defendants (Powell, Amy)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
August 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT, OPEN THE GOVERNMENT (Topic, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT, OPEN THE GOVERNMENT (Burday, Joshua)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7484764) filed by OPEN THE GOVERNMENT, GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Burday, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OPEN THE GOVERNMENT et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Amy E. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
Represented By: Amy E. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OPEN THE GOVERNMENT
Represented By: Joshua Hart Burday
Represented By: Matthew Topic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT
Represented By: Joshua Hart Burday
Represented By: Matthew Topic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?