JUSTICE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: ROBERT V. JUSTICE
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv02301
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 USCA Case Number 20-5287 for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (zrdj)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. Motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis has been filed. Another transmission will be forwarded when the motion has been decided re #5 Notice of Appeal. (adh, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by ROBERT V. JUSTICE (adh, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case, #3 Memorandum & Opinion by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Fee Status: IFP. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(adh, )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/25/2020. (adh, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/25/2020. (adh, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERT V. JUSTICE (zsb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by ROBERT V. JUSTICE. (Attachment: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zsb)
August 18, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 08/18/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUSTICE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT V. JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?