FIROVA v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ESTHER KURCZYN FIROVA
Defendant: SEAN PATRICK CUMMINGS, STEPHANIE MARIE CUMMINGS, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. and TROY DELANTE MCCULLOUGH
Case Number: 1:2020cv02302
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 26 CROSSCLAIM (CORRECTED) against SEAN PATRICK CUMMINGS, STEPHANIE MARIE CUMMINGS filed by TROY DELANTE MCCULLOUGH.(Fitzgerald, Jennifer)
October 15, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (CORRECTED) by TROY DELANTE MCCULLOUGH.(Fitzgerald, Jennifer)
October 15, 2020 Filing 24 CROSSCLAIM against SEAN PATRICK CUMMINGS, STEPHANIE MARIE CUMMINGS filed by TROY DELANTE MCCULLOUGH.(Fitzgerald, Jennifer)
October 15, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by TROY DELANTE MCCULLOUGH.(Fitzgerald, Jennifer)
October 8, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Kiely on behalf of ESTHER KURCZYN FIROVA (Kiely, Matthew)
September 29, 2020 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TROY DELANTE MCCULLOUGH served on 9/26/2020, answer due 10/17/2020 (Brown, Daniel)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's motion for continuance, Dkt. #19 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The initial scheduling conference set for September 28, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and is RESCHEDULED for November 17, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. to take place telephonically. Parties may contact the Deputy Clerk to obtain the teleconference number and access code. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/23/2020. (lcrdm1)
September 22, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Continue the Initial Scheduling Conference by ESTHER KURCZYN FIROVA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Daniel)
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Chick, Carly)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Gene S. Hagood on behalf of ESTHER KURCZYN FIROVA (Hagood, Gene)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan King on behalf of ESTHER KURCZYN FIROVA (King, Ryan)
September 17, 2020 Filing 20 Receipt on 9/17/2020 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2020 CA 003128 V. (ztd)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to TROY DELANTE MCCULLOUGH. (ztd)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Issue Summons, Dkt. #14 , and the supporting evidence, the motion is hereby GRANTED. The Court finds that Plaintiff's attempts to serve nonresident Defendant Troy Delante McCullough personally have been unsuccessful, that Plaintiff has exercised due diligence in the investigation of the last known address of Defendant McCullough, and that the requirements of D.C. Code 50-1301.07 have been satisfied. Plaintiff is ORDERED to effect alternative service as requested in her motion on nonresident Defendant Troy Delante McCullough in accordance with D.C. Code 50-1301.07 by leaving a copy of the process with a fee of $2 with the D.C. Mayor or in her office and then sending notice of such service and a copy of the summons and complaint by certified mail without return receipt to Defendant McCullough at his last known address of 8711 Contee Road, Apt. 104, Laurel, MD 20708. Plaintiff shall submit a declaration, under penalty of perjury, attesting that each of the requirements of 50-1301.07 have been satisfied and that a copy of the complaint and summons have been served by certified mail on Defendant Troy Delante McCullough at his last known address. The Deputy Clerk of Court is directed to sign, seal and issue the summons, Attachment 2 at Dkt. #14 , to the Plaintiff for service on the Defendant. Service of process on Defendant McCullough will be complete upon compliance with this Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/16/2020. (lcrdm1)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Issue Summons by ESTHER KURCZYN FIROVA (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Diligence, #2 Summons, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Daniel)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's motion to admit Gene S. Hagood pro hac vice, Dkt. #13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Gene S. Hagood is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/10/2020. (lcrdm1)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gene S. Hagood, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7569721. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ESTHER KURCZYN FIROVA (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Daniel)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Ryan King's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, Dkt. #12 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Ryan King may appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a). Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/09/2020. (lcrdm1) Modified on 9/9/2020 to add missing sentence. (kt).
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ryan King, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7564216. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ESTHER KURCZYN FIROVA (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Daniel)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Brown on behalf of ESTHER KURCZYN FIROVA (Brown, Daniel)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby set for September 28, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. to take place telephonically. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a report and a proposed scheduling order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3(d) on or before September 21, 2020. See attached order for details. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will provide the parties with the teleconference number and access code. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/27/2020. (lcrdm1) Modified on 8/27/2020 to add direction regarding teleconference number (kt).
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SEAN PATRICK CUMMINGS, STEPHANIE MARIE CUMMINGS (Hetherington, Robert) (Main Document 9 replaced fillable document to pdf on 8/27/2020) (ztd).
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Brian Hetherington on behalf of SEAN PATRICK CUMMINGS, STEPHANIE MARIE CUMMINGS (Hetherington, Robert)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by SEAN PATRICK CUMMINGS, STEPHANIE MARIE CUMMINGS.(Hetherington, Robert)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Burns, Eric)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC..(Burns, Eric)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the directives set forth in the Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/21/2020. (lcrdm1)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, )
August 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET (CORRECTING DEFICIENCY) by STEPHANIE MARIE CUMMINGS, SEAN PATRICK CUMMINGS re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by STEPHANIE MARIE CUMMINGS, SEAN PATRICK CUMMINGS. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by STEPHANIE MARIE CUMMINGS, SEAN PATRICK CUMMINGS.(Hetherington, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 003128 V Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7489363 filed by STEPHANIE MARIE CUMMINGS, SEAN PATRICK CUMMINGS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Hetherington, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIROVA v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTHER KURCZYN FIROVA
Represented By: Ryan King
Represented By: Gene S. Hagood
Represented By: Matthew Kiely
Represented By: Daniel A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN PATRICK CUMMINGS
Represented By: Robert Brian Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIE MARIE CUMMINGS
Represented By: Robert Brian Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Eric Patrick Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROY DELANTE MCCULLOUGH
Represented By: Jennifer H Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?