BURNSIDE v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Plaintiff: JOHN BURNSIDE
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Case Number: 1:2020cv02309
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3 Order Transferring Pro Se Case by JOHN BURNSIDE (zsb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Southern District of Indiana. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 10/19/2020. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/29/2020. (zsb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOHN BURNSIDE (zsb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS with Jury Demand filed by JOHN BURNSIDE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(zsb)
August 18, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 08/18/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURNSIDE v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BURNSIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?