SCHAEFER v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Plaintiff: JASON PAUL SCHAEFER
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2020cv02315
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(ztd)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons (1) Issued as to UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (ztd)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court, including rules regarding service of process. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to : JASON PAUL SCHAEFER, 80560065, SHERIDAN FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 6000, SHERIDAN, OR 97378 (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/2/2020. (DJS)
August 19, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, US Attorney and Attorney General (ztd)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616103957) filed by JASON PAUL SCHAEFER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHAEFER v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON PAUL SCHAEFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?