MCBRIDE v. C R BARD INC et al
Plaintiff: MARLENE MCBRIDE
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE, C R BARD INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02327
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Due to an error, the Court's #26 Order dated August 29, 2020, may have been sent to the wrong address for Attorney Eric Martin Przybysz. In light of that error, the Court hereby ORDERS that no later than October 28, 2020, Plaintiff shall secure counsel who is a member of the Bar of this Court and counsel shall promptly enter an appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this order to the following address: Eric Martin Przybysz, 5473 Blair Rd., Dallas, TX 75231. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 09/29/20.(lctjk2)
September 9, 2020 Filing 30 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MCKESSON CORPORATION (Busman, Philip)
September 9, 2020 Filing 29 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C R BARD INC (Busman, Philip)
September 9, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C R BARD INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Busman, Philip)
September 9, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip M. Busman on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C R BARD INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION (Busman, Philip)
August 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER to parties to act within 30 days or risk dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute or entry of default. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this order to the following addresses: (1) Eric Martin Przybysz, 5473 Bair Rd., Dallas, TX 75231; and (2) Melissa Dorman Matthews, 8750 N Central Expressway, Suite 1600, Dallas, TX 75231. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/29/2020. (lctjk3)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/25/20. (lctjk2)
August 24, 2020 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02385. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #17 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Stacy Eckenrod's case be severed and transferred to the Harrisburg Division of the Middle District of Pennsylvania (Civil case 3:20-cv-2382 opened); b. Plaintiff Ashley Hartman-Massey's case be severed and transferred to the Plano Division of the Eastern District of Texas (Civil case 3-20-cv-2383 opened); c. Plaintiff Toni Hines's case be severed and transferred to the Pittsburgh Division of the Western District of Texas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2384 opened); d. Plaintiff Marlene McBride's case be severed and transferred to the District of Columbia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2385 opened); e. Plaintiff Karen McKay's case be severed and transferred to the Las Vegas Division of the District Court of Nevada (Civil case 3:20-cv-2386 opened); f. Plaintiff Michael Rael's case be severed and transferred to the Lubbock Division of the Northern District of Texas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2387 opened); g. Plaintiff Denise Rowe's case be severed and transferred to the Manassas Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2388 opened); h. Plaintiff Robert Stuebs's case be severed and transferred to the Kansas City Division of the District of Kansas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2389 oepned); i. Plaintiff Terry Walley's case be severed and transferred to the Wilmington Division of the District of Delaware (Civil case 3:20-cv-2390 opened). Plaintiff Eric Ramirez is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, he shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/19/2020) (jmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #17 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
August 8, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #20 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 8/10/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/3/2020) (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 Appendix in Support filed by Stacy Eckenrod, Ashley Hartman-Massey, Toni Hines, Marlene McBride, Karen McKay, Michael Rael, Eric Ramirez, Denise Rowe, Robert Stuebs, Terry Walley re #17 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Stacy Eckenrod, Ashley Hartman-Massey, Toni Hines, Marlene McBride, Karen McKay, Michael Rael, Eric Ramirez, Denise Rowe, Robert Stuebs, Terry Walley re #17 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Stacy Eckenrod, Ashley Hartman-Massey, Toni Hines, Marlene McBride, Karen McKay, Michael Rael, Eric Ramirez, Denise Rowe, Robert Stuebs, Terry Walley (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Stacy Eckenrod, Ashley Hartman-Massey, Toni Hines, Marlene McBride, Karen McKay, Michael Rael, Eric Ramirez, Denise Rowe, Robert Stuebs, Terry Walley re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Stacy Eckenrod, Ashley Hartman-Massey, Toni Hines, Marlene McBride, Karen McKay, Michael Rael, Eric Ramirez, Denise Rowe, Robert Stuebs, Terry Walley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Completed Plaintiff Forms) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Stacy Eckenrod, Ashley Hartman-Massey, Toni Hines, Marlene McBride, Karen McKay, Michael Rael, Eric Ramirez, Denise Rowe, Robert Stuebs, Terry Walley (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Civil action numbers 3:20-CV-1499-X; 3:20-CV-1469-X; 3:20-CV-1566-X; and 3:20-CV-1500-X are hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "S". (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/19/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 11 replaced with the document flattened on 6/17/2020) (pnp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Becton, Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) Modified corporate parent on 6/11/2020 (mla). (Main Document 5 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10900958) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index to State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Jury Demand, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Return of Service - C.R.Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCBRIDE v. C R BARD INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R BARD INC
Represented By: Philip M. Busman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: Philip M. Busman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.
Represented By: Philip M. Busman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLENE MCBRIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?