TITAN TITLE, LLC v. TITAN TITLE GROUP LLC
Plaintiff: TITAN TITLE, LLC
Defendant: TITAN TITLE GROUP LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02343
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 First MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by TITAN TITLE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Ludwig, #2 Exhibit A to Ludwig Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Ludwig Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Ludwig Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Ludwig Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Ludwig Decl., #7 Exhibit F to Ludwig Decl., #8 Exhibit G to Ludwig Decl., #9 Exhibit H to Ludwig Decl.)(Ludwig, David)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by TITAN TITLE GROUP LLC (Selby, Karen)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TITAN TITLE GROUP LLC served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020 (Ludwig, David)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (znmw)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to TITAN TITLE GROUP LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
August 25, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmc)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TITAN TITLE, LLC (Ludwig, David)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TITAN TITLE GROUP LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7505404) filed by TITAN TITLE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Ludwig, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TITAN TITLE, LLC v. TITAN TITLE GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITAN TITLE GROUP LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Selby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TITAN TITLE, LLC
Represented By: David Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?