ARUNACHALAM v. INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION
Plaintiff: LAKSHMI ARUNACHALAM
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv02362
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by LAKSHMI ARUNACHALAM re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by LAKSHMI ARUNACHALAM. (adh, )
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperisORDERED that, within 30 days from the filing date of this order, plaintiff shall show cause in writing why the complaint should not be transferred in the interests of justice to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. If plaintiff fails to file a timely and adequate response to this order, the case will be subject to transfer or dismissal. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/29/2020. (adh, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by LAKSHMI ARUNACHALAM (adh, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LAKSHMI ARUNACHALAM (adh, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION with Jury Demand filed by LAKSHMI ARUNACHALAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(adh, )
August 24, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/24/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARUNACHALAM v. INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKSHMI ARUNACHALAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?