VOTE FORWARD et al v. DEJOY et al
Plaintiff: VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, VOTE FORWARD, AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, GARY YOUNG, MARTHA THOMPSON, INDERBIR SINGH DATTA, SEAN MORRISON, AMY BOLAN, KATHRYN MONTGOMERY, DANTE FLORES-DEMARCHI, PAUL HUNTER, LINDA ROBERSON and SEBASTIAN IMMONEN
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE and LOUIS DEJOY
Amicus Curiae: UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Case Number: 1:2020cv02405
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, Revised Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Enforce and Monitor Compliance with Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing filed by AMY BOLAN, AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, INDERBIR SINGH DATTA, DANTE FLORES-DEMARCHI, PAUL HUNTER, SEBASTIAN IMMONEN, KATHRYN MONTGOMERY, SEAN MORRISON, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, LINDA ROBERSON, MARTHA THOMPSON, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, VOTE FORWARD, GARY YOUNG. (Duraiswamy, Shankar)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #37 Plaintiffs' reply brief, in which Plaintiffs request for the first time that the Court order Defendants to take certain additional actions to comply with the Court's Order, ECF No. 31, Plaintiffs shall file a revised proposed order by no later than October 27, 2020 at 8:00 AM setting out the precise relief they seek. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/26/2020. (lcegs3)
October 26, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Fram on behalf of AMY BOLAN, AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, INDERBIR SINGH DATTA, DANTE FLORES-DEMARCHI, PAUL HUNTER, SEBASTIAN IMMONEN, KATHRYN MONTGOMERY, SEAN MORRISON, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, LINDA ROBERSON, MARTHA THOMPSON, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, VOTE FORWARD, GARY YOUNG (Fram, Robert)
October 26, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to opposition to motion re #33 Emergency MOTION to Enforce and Monitor Compliance with Preliminary InjunctionEmergency MOTION for Hearing and Briefing filed by AMY BOLAN, AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, INDERBIR SINGH DATTA, DANTE FLORES-DEMARCHI, PAUL HUNTER, SEBASTIAN IMMONEN, KATHRYN MONTGOMERY, SEAN MORRISON, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, LINDA ROBERSON, MARTHA THOMPSON, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, VOTE FORWARD, GARY YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Letter Report Including USPS Service Score Data (Oct. 23, 2020), #3 Exhibit 2 - Tr. of Deposition of Robert Cintron, NY v. Trump, #4 Exhibit 3 - Tr. of Deposition of Robert Cintron, Pa. v. DeJoy, #5 Exhibit 4 - E-mail from Robert Cintron (July 14, 2020), #6 Exhibit 5 - Letter Report Including USPS Service Score Data (Oct. 16, 2020))(Duraiswamy, Shankar)
October 26, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2020 at 11:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Plaintiffs Reply due no later than 12:00PM on 10/26/20 (mac)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #36 response to the emergency motion to enforce and monitor compliance with the preliminary injunction, Plaintiffs shall file their reply by no later than October 26, 2020 at 12:00 PM. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a motion hearing is scheduled for October 27, 2020 at 11:00 AM via VIDEO TELECONFERENCE ("VTC"). The parties shall contact Mr. Mark Coates, the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, for the dial-in information. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/23/2020. (lcegs3)
October 23, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE re #33 Emergency MOTION to Enforce and Monitor Compliance with Preliminary InjunctionEmergency MOTION for Hearing and Briefing filed by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cholera, Kuntal)
October 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Complaint due by 12/11/2020. (mac)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #35 unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by no later than December 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/22/2020. (lcegs3)
October 22, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Response To The Motion due no later than 3:00PM on 10/23/2020. (mac)
October 22, 2020 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, John)
October 22, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by John Robinson on behalf of All Defendants (Robinson, John)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #33 emergency motion to enforce and monitor compliance with preliminary injunction, Defendants are directed to file their response to the motion by no later than October 23, 2020 at 3:00 PM. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/22/2020. (lcegs3)
October 22, 2020 Filing 33 Emergency MOTION to Enforce and Monitor Compliance with Preliminary Injunction, Emergency MOTION for Hearing and Briefing by AMY BOLAN, AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, INDERBIR SINGH DATTA, DANTE FLORES-DEMARCHI, PAUL HUNTER, SEBASTIAN IMMONEN, KATHRYN MONTGOMERY, SEAN MORRISON, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, LINDA ROBERSON, MARTHA THOMPSON, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, VOTE FORWARD, GARY YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Enforce and Monitor Compliance with Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit A - Postmaster General DeJoy Testimony Tr. Aug. 24: House Oversight Hearing, #4 Exhibit B - Tr. of Deposition of Robert Cintron, NY v. Trump, #5 Exhibit C - USPS Service Score Data, #6 Exhibit D - Supp. Grimmer Decl., NY v. Trump, #7 Exhibit E - USPS Mar. 1 - Oct. 11, 2020 Extra Trips Data, #8 Exhibit F - USPS Mar. 1 - Oct. 11, 2020 Late Trips Data, #9 Exhibit G - USPS Daily Late and Extra Trips from Oct. 1 through Oct. 15, 2020, #10 Exhibit H - Decl. of Joshua Colin, Pa. v. DeJoy, #11 Exhibit I - Mem. from Kristin A. Seaver & David E. Williams to Officers, #12 Exhibit J - Tr. of Deposition of Robert Justin Glass, NY v. Trump, #13 Exhibit K - Supp. Grimmer Decl., Vote Forward v. DeJoy, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Duraiswamy, Shankar)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #20 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 "vests the trial judge with broad discretion to tailor discovery narrowly and to dictate the sequence of discovery." Watts v. SEC, 483 F.3d 501, 507 (D.C. Cir. 2007) (quoting Crawford-El v. Britton, 523 U.S. 574, 598 (1998)). Courts typically consider five factors when evaluating a motion for expedited discovery under the good-cause standard: "(1) whether a preliminary injunction is pending; (2) the breadth of the discovery requests; (3) the purpose for requesting the expedited discovery; (4) the burden on the defendants to comply with the requests; and (5) how far in advance of the typical discovery process the request was made." Guttenberg v. Emery, 26 F. Supp. 3d 88, 98 (D.D.C. 2014) (quoting In re Fannie Mae Derivative Litig., 227 F.R.D. 142, 14243 (D.D.C. 2005)). Courts are not limited to these factors, but the factors provide "guidelines for the exercise of the Court's discretion." Id. The Court finds that the good-cause standard is met here. As an initial matter, the Court notes that plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction has been granted. See Order, ECF No. 31. Second, the Court has reviewed the discovery requests and has determined that they are narrow and carefully targeted to discover the facts necessary for plaintiffs to establish their claims and rebut anticipated defenses. Plaintiffs shall ensure that they do not request discovery that has already been provided by the defendants in similar actions, specifically Pennsylvania v. DeJoy, No. 20-cv-4096 (E.D. Pa.) and Washington v. Trump, No. 20-cv-3127 (E.D. Wash.). Third, the purpose for requesting the expedited discovery supports granting plaintiffs' motion given the imminence of the election and the claim for which plaintiffs did not seek a preliminary injunction. Fourth, while defendants contend that it will be burdensome on them to comply, they mostly contend that the requests are duplicative and overlapping, or potentially overlapping. However, the Court has directed plaintiffs to ensure they do not request duplicative discovery. Fifth, while the discovery requests here are being made in advance of the typical discovery process, expedited resolution is appropriate given the imminence of the election. Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED that defendants shall serve any objections to plaintiffs' discovery requests by no later than October 7, 2020; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall serve their written responses and shall produce all documents responsive to plaintiffs' discovery requests by no later than October 13, 2020; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that depositions shall be taken by no later than October 16, 2020. The parties shall coordinate with the plaintiffs in State of New York v. Trump, 20-cv-2405, with regard to the taking of the depositions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2020. (lcegs3)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/28/2020. (lcegs3)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/28/2020. (lcegs3)
September 25, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Supplemental Materials by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cholera, Kuntal)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 joint motion for protective order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/25/2020. (lcegs3) Modified to remove "minute" on 9/29/2020 (znmw).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #25 unopposed motion to file supplemental declarations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/25/2020. (lcegs3)
September 23, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to opposition to motion re #20 MOTION to Expedite Discovery -- Reply In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery and Case Schedule filed by AMY BOLAN, AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, INDERBIR SINGH DATTA, DANTE FLORES-DEMARCHI, PAUL HUNTER, SEBASTIAN IMMONEN, KATHRYN MONTGOMERY, SEAN MORRISON, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, LINDA ROBERSON, MARTHA THOMPSON, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, VOTE FORWARD, GARY YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff States First Interrogatories and Requests for Production (as filed in E.D. Wash.), #3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs First Request for Production of Documents (as filed in E.D. Pa.), #4 Exhibit 3 - Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery (as filed in E.D. Wash.), #5 Exhibit 4 - Order Granting Expedited Discovery (as filed in E.D. Pa.), #6 Exhibit 5 - Revised Proposed Order)(Duraiswamy, Shankar)
September 22, 2020 Filing 27 AMICUS BRIEF by UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (zjf)
September 22, 2020 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (502(D) Order) by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Cholera, Kuntal)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #19 motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs by UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/22/2020. (lcegs3)
September 22, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by AMY BOLAN, AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, INDERBIR SINGH DATTA, DANTE FLORES-DEMARCHI, PAUL HUNTER, SEBASTIAN IMMONEN, KATHRYN MONTGOMERY, SEAN MORRISON, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, LINDA ROBERSON, MARTHA THOMPSON, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, VOTE FORWARD, GARY YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin Grimmer, #2 Declaration of Ruth Goldway, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Duraiswamy, Shankar)
September 20, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to opposition to motion re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AMY BOLAN, AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, INDERBIR SINGH DATTA, DANTE FLORES-DEMARCHI, PAUL HUNTER, SEBASTIAN IMMONEN, KATHRYN MONTGOMERY, SEAN MORRISON, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, LINDA ROBERSON, MARTHA THOMPSON, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, VOTE FORWARD, GARY YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Declaration of Justin Grimmer, #3 Declaration of Ruth Goldway)(Duraiswamy, Shankar)
September 18, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #20 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cholera, Kuntal)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #22 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Lawrence A. Hobel is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/16/2020. (lcegs3)
September 16, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lawrence A. Hobel, Filing fee $ 100. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMY BOLAN, AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, INDERBIR SINGH DATTA, DANTE FLORES-DEMARCHI, PAUL HUNTER, SEBASTIAN IMMONEN, KATHRYN MONTGOMERY, SEAN MORRISON, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, LINDA ROBERSON, MARTHA THOMPSON, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, VOTE FORWARD, GARY YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of L. Hobel, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Duraiswamy, Shankar)
September 15, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Barber, Cintron, Curtis, #2 Declaration Colin, Couch, DeChambeau, Glass, Prokity, Vo, #3 Declaration Supplemental Cintron, Curtis, #4 Exhibit 1-15)(Cholera, Kuntal)
September 14, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by AMY BOLAN, AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, INDERBIR SINGH DATTA, DANTE FLORES-DEMARCHI, PAUL HUNTER, SEBASTIAN IMMONEN, KATHRYN MONTGOMERY, SEAN MORRISON, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, LINDA ROBERSON, MARTHA THOMPSON, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, VOTE FORWARD, GARY YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs First Request for Production of Documents, #4 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs First Request for Admissions, #6 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition on Impact of Policy, #7 Exhibit E - Plaintiffs Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition on Cost Savings Justification, #8 Exhibit F - Plaintiffs Notice of 30(b)(1) Deposition of Curtis, #9 Exhibit G - Plaintiffs Notice of 30(b)(1) Deposition of Glass, #10 Exhibit H - Plaintiffs Notice of 30(b)(1) Deposition o Cintron, #11 Exhibit I - Guidelines (as filed in SDNY), #12 Exhibit J - Guidelines Spreadsheet (as produced in EDWA), #13 Exhibit K - Transmittal Email (as produced in EDWA), #14 Exhibit L - USPS Publication 632, #15 Exhibit M - June 2020 OIG Audit, #16 Exhibit N - July 2020 Mandatory Stand-Up Talk, #17 Exhibit O - July 2020 PMG Expectations, #18 Exhibit P - July 2020 USPS Letter to PA Election Officials, #19 Exhibit Q - August 2020 DeJoy Memo, #20 Exhibit R - August 2020 OIG Auditi, #21 Exhibit S - August 2020 USPS Congressional Briefing PowerPoint, #22 Exhibit T - Cintron Declaration (as filed in SDNY), #23 Exhibit U - Curtis Declaration (as filed in SDNY), #24 Exhibit V - Glass Declaration (as filed in SDNY))(Duraiswamy, Shankar)
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs by UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief of U.S. House of Representatives as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Letter, Douglas)
September 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Opposition due by 9/15/2020. Plaintiffs Reply due by 9/20/2020. (mac)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting #14 joint motion for protective order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/9/2020. (lcegs3)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #16 Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction, the parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: (1) Defendants shall file their opposition by no later than September 15, 2020, see L. Civ. R. 65.1(c); and (2) Plaintiffs shall file their reply by no later than September 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/9/2020. (lcegs3)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AMY BOLAN, AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, INDERBIR SINGH DATTA, DANTE FLORES-DEMARCHI, PAUL HUNTER, SEBASTIAN IMMONEN, KATHRYN MONTGOMERY, SEAN MORRISON, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, LINDA ROBERSON, MARTHA THOMPSON, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, VOTE FORWARD, GARY YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit USPS OIG Report (Aug. 2020), #4 Exhibit USPS, Postal Operations Manual (Excerpts), #5 Exhibit USPS OIG Report (May 2020), #6 Exhibit USPS, Mandatory Stand-Up Talk: All Employees, #7 Exhibit Leaked USPS Powerpoint, #8 Exhibit DeJoy Testimony - House Oversight Hearing (Aug. 24, 2020), #9 Exhibit DeJoy Testimony - Senate Hearing (Aug. 21, 2020), #10 Exhibit Statement of DeJoy - House Oversight Comm. (Aug. 24, 2020), #11 Declaration Professor Justin Grimmer, #12 Exhibit USPS, Congressional Briefing (Aug. 31, 2020), #13 Exhibit Chart of States Where Voters' Mail-In Ballots Are Impacted By Defendants' Delays, #14 Exhibit USPS Letter to Pa. (July 29, 2020), #15 Declaration Eitran D. Hersh, #16 Exhibit House Oversight Hearing on USPS Operations - Transcript (Aug. 24, 2020), #17 Exhibit Senate HSGAC Hearing on USPS Operations - Transcript (Aug. 21, 2020), #18 Declaration Aaron Carrel, #19 Declaration Martha Thompson, #20 Declaration Kathryn Montgomery, #21 Declaration Sebastian Immonen, #22 Declaration Amy Bolan, #23 Declaration Inderbir Singh Datta, #24 Declaration Scott J. Forman of Vote Forward, #25 Declaration Alex Sanchez of Voces Unidas De Las Montanas, #26 Text of Proposed Order)(Duraiswamy, Shankar)
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE filed by AARON CARREL, VOTE FORWARD, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, PAUL HUNTER, INDERBIR SINGH DATTA, GARY YOUNG, DANTE FLORES-DEMARCHI, SEBASTIAN IMMONEN, LINDA ROBERSON, MARTHA THOMPSON, SEAN MORRISON, AMY BOLAN, KATHRYN MONTGOMERY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - USPS Mandatory Stand Up Talk, #2 Exhibit 2 - States Where Voters' Mail-in Ballots Are Impacted By Defendants' Delays, #3 Exhibit 3 - USPS Letter to PA Election Officials, #4 Exhibit 4 - Redline from Original Complaint)(Duraiswamy, Shankar)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Cholera, Kuntal)
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kuntal Virendra Cholera on behalf of All Defendants (Cholera, Kuntal)
September 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #11 response to order to show cause, as well as the responses from parties in Richardson v. Trump, 20-2262; National Association for the Advancement of Colored People v. U.S. Postal Service, 20-2295; and State of New York v. Trump, 20-2340, the Court shall not consolidate the cases as related pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a) and Local Civil Rule 40.5(a)(3). It is ORDERED that the parties shall coordinate schedules for discovery purposes to the extent possible. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/5/2020. (lcegs3)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/04/20. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Minute Order entered on 09/01/2020 by AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, VOTE FORWARD. (Duraiswamy, Shankar) Modified on 9/6/2020 to correct docket text (zjf).
September 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Show Cause due no later than 12:00PM on 9/4/2020. (mac)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court, sua sponte, directs the Plaintiff to show cause why this action should not be consolidated as related with National Association for the Advancement of Colored People v. U.S. Postal Service, 20-2295; Richardson v. Trump, 20-2262; and State of New York v. Trump, 20-2340 by no later than September 4, 2020 at 12:00 PM. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) (permitting the court to consolidate actions "involv[ing] a common question of law or fact"); Local Civ. R. 40.5(a)(3) (defining related civil actions). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/1/2020. (lcegs3)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. John W. Fraser is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/28/2020. (lcegs2)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Diane Ramirez is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/28/2020. (lcegs2)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Robert D. Fram is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/28/2020. (lcegs2)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John W. Fraser, Filing fee $ 100. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, VOTE FORWARD (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John W. Fraser, #2 Proposed Order)(Duraiswamy, Shankar)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Diane Ramirez, Filing fee $ 100. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, VOTE FORWARD (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diane Ramirez, #2 Proposed Order)(Duraiswamy, Shankar)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert D. Fram, Filing fee $ 100. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, VOTE FORWARD (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Robert D. Fram, #2 Proposed Order)(Duraiswamy, Shankar)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
August 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AARON CARREL, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, VOTE FORWARD. Case related to Case No. 20-2340. (adh, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS (Duraiswamy, Shankar)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS (Duraiswamy, Shankar)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS (Duraiswamy, Shankar)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VOTE FORWARD (Duraiswamy, Shankar)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by VOTE FORWARD, COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS, AARON CARREL, PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - USPS Mandatory Stand-Up Talk, #2 Exhibit 2 - Chart of States Where Voters Mail-in Ballots Are Impacted By Defendants Delays, #3 Exhibit 3 - USPS Letter to PA Election Officials, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons - L. DeJoy, #6 Summons - USPS, #7 Summons - W. Barr, #8 Summons - M. Sherwin, #9 Notice to Counsel/Party Regarding Related Cases)(Duraiswamy, Shankar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VOTE FORWARD et al v. DEJOY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VOCES UNIDAS DE LAS MONTANAS
Represented By: Shankar Duraiswamy
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PADRES & JOVENES UNIDOS
Represented By: Shankar Duraiswamy
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VOTE FORWARD
Represented By: Shankar Duraiswamy
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON CARREL
Represented By: Shankar Duraiswamy
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLORADO ORGANIZATION FOR LATINA OPPORTUNITY AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS
Represented By: Shankar Duraiswamy
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY YOUNG
Represented By: Shankar Duraiswamy
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA THOMPSON
Represented By: Shankar Duraiswamy
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDERBIR SINGH DATTA
Represented By: Shankar Duraiswamy
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN MORRISON
Represented By: Shankar Duraiswamy
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY BOLAN
Represented By: Shankar Duraiswamy
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN MONTGOMERY
Represented By: Shankar Duraiswamy
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANTE FLORES-DEMARCHI
Represented By: Shankar Duraiswamy
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL HUNTER
Represented By: Shankar Duraiswamy
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA ROBERSON
Represented By: Shankar Duraiswamy
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEBASTIAN IMMONEN
Represented By: Shankar Duraiswamy
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Kuntal Virendra Cholera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS DEJOY
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Kuntal Virendra Cholera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?