JACK I. BENDER & SONS v. THE GAP, INC.
Plaintiff: JACK I. BENDER & SONS
Defendant: THE GAP, INC. and GAP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02417
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 19 Receipt on 10/21/2020 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court (Part 7). Superior Court Number 2020 CA 003261 B. (eg)
October 22, 2020 Filing 18 Receipt on 10/21/2020 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court (Part 6). Superior Court Number 2020 CA 003261 B. (eg)
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 Receipt on 10/21/2020 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court (Part 5). Superior Court Number 2020 CA 003261 B. (eg)
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 Receipt on 10/21/2020 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court (Part 4). Superior Court Number 2020 CA 003261 B. (eg)
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 Receipt on 10/21/2020 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court (Part 3). Superior Court Number 2020 CA 003261 B. (eg)
October 22, 2020 Filing 14 Receipt on 10/21/2020 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court (Part 2). Superior Court Number 2020 CA 003261 B. (eg)
October 22, 2020 Filing 13 Receipt on 10/21/2020 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court (Part 1). Superior Court Number 200 CA 003261 B. (eg)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 7, 2020. (lccjn3)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(FitzPatrick, Christopher)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 Plaintiff-Counter Defendant's ANSWER to Counterclaim #9 by JACK I. BENDER & SONS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Ex 1)(FitzPatrick, Christopher)
September 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 10/7/2020. (zcal)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a Complaint and Defendant's #9 Answer. Accordingly, the Parties shall meet and confer to discuss each of the matters set forth in Local Civil Rule 16.3(c). The Parties shall submit a Joint Meet and Confer Report addressing all topics listed in Local Civil Rule 16.3(c) by October 7, 2020. The Parties shall also submit a proposed scheduling order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3(d). After submission of the Joint Meet and Confer Report, the Court will, if necessary, schedule an Initial Scheduling Conference. Following submission of the Joint Meet and Confer Report or following the Initial Scheduling Conference, the Court will issue a Scheduling Order governing proceedings in the case. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 18, 2020. (lccjn3)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against JACK I. BENDER & SONS by GAP, INC..(Hanes, Patrick)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. FitzPatrick on behalf of JACK I. BENDER & SONS (FitzPatrick, Christopher)
September 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/14/2020. (zcal)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendant's #6 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 3, 2020. (lccjn3)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action with the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation by GAP, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hanes, Patrick)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GAP, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hanes, Patrick)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 2, 2020. (lccjn3)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
August 31, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by THE GAP, INC. (Hanes, Patrick)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Risdon Hanes on behalf of THE GAP, INC. (Hanes, Patrick)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 003261 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7523597 filed by THE GAP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanes, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACK I. BENDER & SONS v. THE GAP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GAP, INC.
Represented By: Patrick Risdon Hanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAP, INC.
Represented By: Patrick Risdon Hanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACK I. BENDER & SONS
Represented By: Christopher M. FitzPatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?