ALLEN v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Plaintiff: LINWOOD ALLEN
Defendant: CONCEALED PISTOL LICENSING REVIEW BOARD, EDWIN POWELL, CHAD E. TILLBROOK, GARY L. ABRECHT, J DOES, PETER NEWSHAM, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, COLIN HALL and J. DOES
Case Number: 1:2020cv02453
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part #2 #3 #4 #5 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Matthew R. Skanchy, Jennifer H. Pavelec, Benjamin D. Raker, and Kieran G. Gostin may be heard in open court on behalf of Plaintiff, but may not file papers in this court. See Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2) ("An attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of the District of Columbia Bar AND the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court."). Counsel are hereby reminded that Local Civil Rule 7(c), requires that "[e]ach motion... shall be accompanied by a proposed order." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/19/2020. (DJS)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Sobiecki on behalf of All Defendants (Sobiecki, Richard)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/6/2020. (tb)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 11/6/20. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/21/2020. (DJS)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint by GARY L. ABRECHT, CONCEALED PISTOL LICENSING REVIEW BOARD, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, J DOES, COLIN HALL, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, PETER NEWSHAM, EDWIN POWELL, CHAD E. TILLBROOK (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saindon, Andrew) Modified event on 9/18/2020 (ztd).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Saindon on behalf of All Defendants (Saindon, Andrew)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, District of Columbia Attorney General, and the District of Columbia Mayor. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ztd)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT served on 9/14/2020; PETER NEWSHAM served on 9/14/2020 (Whitman, Hayter)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA served on 9/14/2020 (Whitman, Hayter)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GARY L. ABRECHT served on 9/14/2020; CONCEALED PISTOL LICENSING REVIEW BOARD served on 9/14/2020; COLIN HALL served on 9/14/2020; EDWIN POWELL served on 9/14/2020; CHAD E. TILLBROOK served on 9/14/2020 (Whitman, Hayter)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COLIN HALL served on 9/4/2020 (Whitman, Hayter)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PETER NEWSHAM served on 9/4/2020 (Whitman, Hayter)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT served on 9/4/2020 (Whitman, Hayter)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to all named Defendants (for service on DC Office of Attorney General) filed by LINWOOD ALLEN.(Whitman, Hayter)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to all named Defendants (for service on DC Mayor) filed by LINWOOD ALLEN.(Whitman, Hayter)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to GARY L. ABRECHT, CONCEALED PISTOL LICENSING REVIEW BOARD, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, COLIN HALL, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, PETER NEWSHAM, EDWIN POWELL, CHAD E. TILLBROOK. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kieran G. Gostin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7541958. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LINWOOD ALLEN (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Whitman, Hayter)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Benjamin D. Raker, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7541941. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LINWOOD ALLEN (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Whitman, Hayter)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer H. Pavelec, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7541706. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LINWOOD ALLEN (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Whitman, Hayter)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew R. Skanchy, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7541495. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LINWOOD ALLEN (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Whitman, Hayter)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7540537) filed by LINWOOD ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Whitman, Hayter)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLEN v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONCEALED PISTOL LICENSING REVIEW BOARD
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Represented By: Richard P. Sobiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWIN POWELL
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Represented By: Richard P. Sobiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD E. TILLBROOK
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Represented By: Richard P. Sobiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY L. ABRECHT
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Represented By: Richard P. Sobiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER NEWSHAM
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Represented By: Richard P. Sobiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Represented By: Richard P. Sobiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Represented By: Richard P. Sobiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLIN HALL
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Represented By: Richard P. Sobiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. DOES
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Represented By: Richard P. Sobiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINWOOD ALLEN
Represented By: Hayter L. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?