JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2020cv02457
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/28/2020. (tj)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #9 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before November 28, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/26/2020. (lcrc2)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Orfanedes, Paul)
October 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/27/2020 (tj)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before October 27, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/13/2020. (lcrc2)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Valdez, Darrell)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Valdez, Darrell)
September 19, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul)
September 19, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/14/20. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul)
September 19, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/16/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
September 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7541336) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons U.S. Dep't of Homeland Security)(Orfanedes, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Represented By: Paul J. Orfanedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Darrell C. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?