SUNBELT RENTALS, INC. v. WINMAR CONSTRUCTION INC. et al
Plaintiff: SUNBELT RENTALS, INC.
Defendant: FORNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., FEI-WINMAR JV, LLC, WINMAR CONSTRUCTION INC. and QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv02501
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEI-WINMAR JV, LLC served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020; QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION served on 10/2/2020, answer due 10/23/2020; WINMAR CONSTRUCTION INC. served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020 (ztd)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION (Blake, Hanna)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Disclosure Corporate by QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION (Blake, Hanna) Modified on 10/23/2020 (zjf).
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION.(Blake, Hanna)
October 23, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #9 MOTION for Disclosure Corporate was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading under the correct event. (zjf)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear telephonically for an Initial Scheduling Conference at 10:45 a.m. on November 18, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a report and a proposed scheduling order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3(d) on or before November 10, 2020. See document for details. Parties may obtain a teleconference number and access code from the Deputy Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/19/2020. (lcrdm1)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WINMAR CONSTRUCTION INC. (Camp, Charles)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by WINMAR CONSTRUCTION INC..(Camp, Charles)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/09/2020. (lcrdm1)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEI-Winmar JV, LLC, FORNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION, WINMAR CONSTRUCTION INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) Modified on 9/18/2020 (znmw).
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Knowles, Kavita)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7562633) filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Knowles, Kavita) .
September 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUNBELT RENTALS, INC. v. WINMAR CONSTRUCTION INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUNBELT RENTALS, INC.
Represented By: Kavita S. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORNEY ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEI-WINMAR JV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINMAR CONSTRUCTION INC.
Represented By: Charles Henry Camp, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: Hanna Lee Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?