CHAUDHRY et al v. POMPEO et al
Plaintiff: SANA SAEED CHAUDHRY and HASAN SAJJAD
Defendant: MIKE POMPEO, CONN SCHRADER, PAUL W. JONES, CARL C. RISCH and WILLIAM P. BARR
Case Number: 1:2020cv02535
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez Horowitz on behalf of All Defendants (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM P. BARR, PAUL W. JONES, MIKE POMPEO, CARL C. RISCH, CONN SCHRADER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/16/2020. (lctjk1)
September 11, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmc)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7575665) filed by SANA SAEED CHAUDHRY, HASAN SAJJAD. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT LIST, #2 EXHIBIT A, #3 EXHIBIT B, #4 EXHIBIT C, #5 CIVIL COVER SHEET, #6 SUMMONS BARR, #7 SUMMONS JONES, #8 SUMMONS POMPEO, #9 SUMMONS RISCH, #10 SUMMONS SCHRADER, #11 SUMMONS US ATTORNEY)(Jeelani, Hashim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHAUDHRY et al v. POMPEO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE POMPEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONN SCHRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL W. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL C. RISCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANA SAEED CHAUDHRY
Represented By: Hashim G. Jeelani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HASAN SAJJAD
Represented By: Hashim G. Jeelani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?