BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION, IBT v. CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Plaintiff: BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION, IBT
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv02543
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Thomas F Hogan
Referring Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 32 Case directly reassigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan as there is an earlier related case. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
September 21, 2020 Cases Consolidated. Cases 20cv2173, 20cv2543, 20cv1767 and 20cv2109 have been consolidated with 19cv3586 pursuant to Minute Order entered 09/21/2020. ALL PLEADINGS MUST BE FILED IN LEAD CASE NO. 19cv3586. THE PARTIES ARE ADVISED NOT TO ELECT TO SPREAD TEXT WHEN FILING IN ECF. (eg)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONSOLIDATION ORDER; Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/21/2020. (See Order For Details) (hs)
September 18, 2020 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Munro, Donald)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/17/20. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
September 11, 2020 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-13112. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION AND ORDER granting #6 Motion to transfer, granting #22 , #23 , and #26 Motions for leave to file and transferring case to the District of Columbia. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Consolidated Rail Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Joseph, James) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Motion Hearing held on 8/6/2020 re #6 MOTION to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay filed by Consolidated Rail Corporation. Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Marie Metcalf) (JMcC) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #6 MOTION to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2020 at 10:30 AM (TIME CHANGE) before District Judge Sean F. Cox |Zoom Webinar Information: https://zoom.us/j/92550955883?pwd=NVdqR3dvb0xmdmF3SlpBUHpCeUZ6dz09 Passcode: 506977 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +13017158592,,92550955883#,,,,,,0#,,506977# or +13126266799,,92550955883#,,,,,,0#,,506977#| (JMcC) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #6 MOTION to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2020 at 10:00 AM (TIME CHANGE) before District Judge Sean F. Cox |Zoom Webinar Information: Please click the link below to join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/92550955883?pwd=NVdqR3dvb0xmdmF3SlpBUHpCeUZ6dz09 Passcode: 506977 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +13126266799,,92550955883#,,,,,,0#,,506977# or +13017158592,,92550955883#,,,,,,0#,,506977# Or Telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 312 626 6799 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 253 215 8782 or +1 602| (JMcC) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
July 4, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Consolidated Rail Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Joseph, James) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Consolidated Rail Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Joseph, James) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Joseph on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation. (Joseph, James) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #20 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Brittany D. Parling filed by Consolidated Rail Corporation. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Brittany D. Parling by Consolidated Rail Corporation. (Parling, Brittany) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER re #17 Joint MOTION Continue Hearing re #11 Notice of Hearing on Motion filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division, IBT. Set Motion Hearing as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay. (Motion Hearing reset for 8/6/2020 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald J. Munro on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation. (Munro, Donald) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Edelman on behalf of Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division, IBT. (Edelman, Richard) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION Continue Hearing re #11 Notice of Hearing on Motion by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division, IBT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order) (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response re #6 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay filed by Consolidated Rail Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Parling, Brittany) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Withdrawing #14 Stipulation and Order and #13 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division, IBT re #15 Notice to Withdraw Motion filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division, IBT. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division, IBT of withdrawal of #13 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Reply Page Limit to 14 Pages and Extending Time to File Reply re #6 MOTION to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay. (Reply due by 2/18/2020) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division, IBT. (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay, #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay , #8 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay and Statement in Support Thereof filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division, IBT. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Peter Kennedy, #3 Exhibit A BMWED ltr to A&S Railway, #4 Exhibit B BMWED ltr to Conrail, #5 Exhibit C BNSF Railway ltr to BMWED, #6 Exhibit D NIRCRC & BMWED Agmt, #7 Exhibit E BMWED & NICTD Agmt, #8 Exhibit F Natl Med Board to BMWED & Metra-NIRCRC, #9 Exhibit G Delaware & Hudson & BMWED MOA, #10 Exhibit H Soo Line & BMWED MOA, #11 Exhibit I NRLC to BLETRCD, #12 Exhibit J Carriers' Summary of Position, #13 Exhibit K What is the NRLC?, #14 Exhibit 2 Complaint FW TX, #15 Exhibit 3 Excerpts Branon Dec & PL Reply Brf, #16 Exhibit 4 Complaint D.D.C., #17 Exhibit 5 Motion to Dismiss D.D.C., #18 Exhibit 6 Griffin Declaration, #19 Exhibit 7 Excerpts of Railroads' Brfs D.D.C., #20 Exhibit 8 Hearing Transcript E.D. MI 94-74457) (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING on #6 MOTION to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING on #6 MOTION to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2020 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay and Statement in Support Thereof by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division, IBT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order) (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division, IBT. (Response due by 1/30/2020) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division, IBT. (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay by Consolidated Rail Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Parling, Brittany) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Consolidated Rail Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation, Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for Consolidated Rail Corporation. (Parling, Brittany) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Dale Parling on behalf of Consolidated Rail Corporation. (Parling, Brittany) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division, IBT waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Consolidated Rail Corporation* (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division, IBT against Consolidated Rail Corporation. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7456867 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Brault, Darcie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/11/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION, IBT v. CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION, IBT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?