POSTAL POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: POSTAL POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION
Defendant: LOUIS DEJOY and UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2020cv02566
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 39 U.S.C. ยง 1208
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by POSTAL POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Report in No. 20-cv-2295)(Romano, Roseann)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to opposition to motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum and Supplemental Affidavits. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/09/2020. (lccrc3)
October 8, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in opposition to re #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Conditional Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction #7 filed by POSTAL POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Frank Albergo with Exhibits, #3 Declaration of James Bjork with Exhibits, #4 Declaration of Jhony Ortiz)(Romano, Roseann)
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by POSTAL POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION. (ztd); (See Docket Entry no. #15 to view.) Modified on 10/8/2020 correct file date (zjf).
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to File a Reply Memorandum and Supplemental Affidavits by POSTAL POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Romano, Roseann) Modified on 10/8/2020 to correct file date (zjf).
October 2, 2020 NOTICE: Having reviewed the Complaint, Plaintiff's #9 Notice of Related Cases, and Defendants' #12 Response thereto, the Court finds that this action and those cited in the Notice neither "relate to common property" nor "involve common issues of fact." The Court therefore declines to transfer the case as related under Local Civil Rule 40.5. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/02/2020. (lccrc3)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE (Notice of Filing of Exhibits) by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #10 Memorandum in Opposition, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Palmer-Ball, Katherine)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #9 Notice of Related Case filed by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Defendants are hereby directed to file a response to the #9 Notice of Related Cases, indicating the Government's position on whether this case is related to the cases cited in the Notice, on or before Friday, October 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/29/2020. (lccrc3)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by POSTAL POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-2340, 20-cv-2405, 20-cv-2262, and 20-cv-2295. (Stephens, Arlus)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/21/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/20/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LOUIS DEJOY served on 9/21/2020; UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE served on 9/21/2020 (Romano, Roseann)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by POSTAL POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of James Bjork with Exhibits, #3 Declaration of John Covell with Exhibits, #4 Declaration of Benjamin Lomasang, #5 Declaration of Eliezer Molina, #6 Declaration of Daniel Patton, #7 Declaration of Edna Sepulveda, #8 Declaration of Danny Simpson, #9 Declaration of Lavonn Traylor Jr., #10 Declaration of Paul White, #11 Declaration of James Wilhoit, #12 Declaration of Denise Williams, #13 Declaration of Samuel Wister, #14 Declaration of Brian Renfroe, #15 Declaration of Arlus J. Stephens with Exhibits)(Romano, Roseann) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/24/2020) (ztd). Modified to replace corrupted document on 9/24/2020 (ztd). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/24/2020) (rj). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/28/2020) (rj).
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer-Ball, Katherine)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by POSTAL POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION (Sinks, Charles)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Andrew Sinks on behalf of POSTAL POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION (Sinks, Charles)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Roseann R Romano on behalf of POSTAL POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION (Romano, Roseann)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LOUIS DEJOY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7587284) filed by POSTAL POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to USPS, #3 Summons Summons to Louis DeJoy)(Stephens, Arlus)
September 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POSTAL POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POSTAL POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Arlus Jeremiah Stephens
Represented By: Charles Andrew Sinks
Represented By: Roseann R Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS DEJOY
Represented By: Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Represented By: Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?