ANNAPOLIS CITIZENS CLASS OVERCHARGED FOR WATER-SEWER v. STANTEC, INC. et al
Plaintiff: LOUDON OPERATIONS LLC and ANNAPOLIS CITIZENS CLASS OVERCHARGED FOR WATER-SEWER
Defendant: GHD, INC., STANTEC, INC., DVO, INC., GHD PROP. LLC, GHD PTY LTD and STANTEC ARCHIT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02603
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants' #11 Motion to Quash Subpoena of Ron Triffo and defendants' #12 Motion to Stay Discovery. A party "may not seek discovery from any source" before a conference under Rule 26(f) unless "authorized by a court order." Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1). The Court has not authorized pre-conference discovery. Defendants' motion to dismiss is pending before the Court, see Defs.' Mot. Dismiss, ECF No. 5, so the parties will not confer under Rule 26(f), and discovery will not begin, until that motion is resolved. Standing Order 3a. Accordingly, plaintiffs' Subpoena of Ron Triffo is QUASHED and the parties are ORDERED to make no further discovery efforts until further order of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 12, 2020. (lcbah4)
November 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Discovery by GHD, INC., STANTEC, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dannenberg, Rebecca)
November 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Ron Triffo by GHD, INC., STANTEC, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Dannenberg, Rebecca)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Sanctions by GHD, INC., STANTEC, INC. (Dannenberg, Rebecca)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE PRAECIPE by ANNAPOLIS CITIZENS CLASS OVERCHARGED FOR WATER-SEWER (Lillard, John)
October 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' responses to Motions #5 , #6 , and #7 due by 11/24/2020. (ztg)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART plaintiff's #8 Motion for Extension of Time and Referral to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Plaintiffs' request for extension of time is GRANTED, and plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file, by November 24, 2020, responses to defendants' #5 Motion to Dismiss, #6 Motion to Strike, and #7 Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs' request for referral of this matter to a Magistrate Judge is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 22, 2020. (lcbah4)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,, Class Allegation contained in the Class Action Complaint, #7 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,, Portions of Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint, #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by ANNAPOLIS CITIZENS CLASS OVERCHARGED FOR WATER-SEWER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lillard, John)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,, Portions of Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by GHD, INC., STANTEC, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dannenberg, Rebecca)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,, Class Allegation contained in the Class Action Complaint by GHD, INC., STANTEC, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Dannenberg, Rebecca)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by GHD, INC., STANTEC, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dannenberg, Rebecca)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANNAPOLIS CITIZENS CLASS OVERCHARGED FOR WATER-SEWER served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020 (Lillard, John)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 21, 2020. (lcbah4)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to GHD, INC., STANTEC, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
September 18, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmc)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stantec & GHD by Annapolis Citizens Class against LOUDON OPERATIONS LLC with Jury Demand Annapolis Citizens Class by Loudon Operations LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7599260) filed by LOUDON OPERATIONS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Class Action Civil RICO & D.C. CPPA Consumer Statute, #2 Summons summonses for Stantec & GHD, #3 Notice and Consent U.S. Magistrate Judge for all matters including Jury Trial, #4 Text of Proposed Order Motion to Certify Class & Proposed Order Granting; Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement)(Lillard, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANNAPOLIS CITIZENS CLASS OVERCHARGED FOR WATER-SEWER v. STANTEC, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHD, INC.
Represented By: Rebecca L. Dannenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANTEC, INC.
Represented By: Rebecca L. Dannenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVO, INC.
Represented By: Rebecca L. Dannenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHD PROP. LLC
Represented By: Rebecca L. Dannenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHD PTY LTD
Represented By: Rebecca L. Dannenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANTEC ARCHIT, INC.
Represented By: Rebecca L. Dannenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUDON OPERATIONS LLC
Represented By: John Franklin Lillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNAPOLIS CITIZENS CLASS OVERCHARGED FOR WATER-SEWER
Represented By: John Franklin Lillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?