STALLARD v. GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH A, STALLARD and JOSEPH A. STALLARD
Defendant: GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC., VOODOO SAS and GOLDMAN SACHS & CO. LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02703
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/20/2021, Response due by 2/17/2021 Reply due by 3/10/2021. (hs)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #6 Defendants Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. and Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC's Assented-to Motion for Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before January 20, 2021, the defendants Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. and Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC (the "Goldman Sachs defendants") shall file their answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's Complaint. It is further ORDERED that, on or before February 17, 2021, the plaintiff shall respond to the Goldman Sachs defendants' forthcoming motion pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12. It is further ORDERED that, on or before March 10, 2021, the Goldman Sachs defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 10, 2020. (lcrbw1)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GOLDMAN SACHS & CO. LLC, GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC. (Levenberg, Keith)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by GOLDMAN SACHS & CO. LLC, GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levenberg, Keith)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE. GOLDMAN SACHS & CO. LLC waiver sent on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (STALLARD, JOSEPH)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to VOODOO SAS. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's #2 Motion for CM/ECF User Name and Password, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall forthwith ISSUE a CM/ECF User Name and Password to the plaintiff. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall forthwith mail a copy of this Minute Order to the plaintiff's address on record. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 21, 2020. (lcrbw1)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to the Court regarding Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver of Summons forms by JOSEPH A, STALLARD (zrdj)
September 18, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to GOLDMAN SACHS & CO. LLC, GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC., VOODOO SAS (ztd)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by JOSEPH A, STALLARD (ztd)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GOLDMAN SACHS & CO. LLC, GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC., VOODOO SAS (Filing fee $ 400; Receipt No.: 4616104216) with Jury Demand filed by JOSEPH A, STALLARD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) Modified on 9/30/2020 (ztd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STALLARD v. GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH A, STALLARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH A. STALLARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Keith E. Levenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOODOO SAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLDMAN SACHS & CO. LLC
Represented By: Keith E. Levenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?