IOWA CITIZENS FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT et al v. COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY et al
Plaintiff: IOWA CITIZENS FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT, ASSOCIATION OF IRRITATED RESIDENTS, ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, INSTITUTE FOR AGRICULTURE AND TRADE POLICY, WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE, INC. and WATERKEEPERS CHESAPEAKE
Defendant: COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY and Mary Neumayr
Case Number: 1:2020cv02715
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #7 MOTION Relief from the Requirements of Local Civil Rule 7(n) filed by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ASSOCIATION OF IRRITATED RESIDENTS, INSTITUTE FOR AGRICULTURE AND TRADE POLICY, IOWA CITIZENS FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT, WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE, INC., WATERKEEPERS CHESAPEAKE. (Waltz, Daniel)
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ASSOCIATION OF IRRITATED RESIDENTS, INSTITUTE FOR AGRICULTURE AND TRADE POLICY, IOWA CITIZENS FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT, WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE, INC., WATERKEEPERS CHESAPEAKE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dan Estrin, #2 Declaration Sandy Bihn, #3 Declaration Rebecca Jim, #4 Declaration Elizabeth Nicholas, #5 Declaration Kathy Phillips, #6 Declaration Ted Evgeniadis, #7 Declaration Adam Mason, #8 Declaration Emma Schmit, #9 Declaration Mark Walden, #10 Declaration Cynthia Parke, #11 Declaration Dierdre Durkis, #12 Declaration Ben Lilliston, #13 Declaration Tom Frantz, #14 Declaration Ryan Yates, #15 Declaration Scott Yager, #16 Exhibit W.D. Va. Order Granting Industry Mot. Intervene)(Waltz, Daniel)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Larissa Ursula Liebmann on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Liebmann, Larissa) (Main Document 12 replaced on 11/13/2020) (ztth).
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their responses to Defendants' #7 Motion for Relief from the Requirements of Local Civil Rule 7(n) and #8 Motion to Dismiss by November 12, 2020. Defendants shall file any replies by December 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/23/2020. (lctjk1)
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #7 MOTION Relief from the Requirements of Local Civil Rule 7(n) by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ASSOCIATION OF IRRITATED RESIDENTS, INSTITUTE FOR AGRICULTURE AND TRADE POLICY, IOWA CITIZENS FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT, WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE, INC., WATERKEEPERS CHESAPEAKE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stella, Cristina)
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/1/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/30/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/01/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY served on 10/1/2020; MARY NEUMAYR served on 10/1/2020 (Waltz, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Marie Boronow on behalf of All Defendants (Boronow, Clare)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, MARY NEUMAYR (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Samford, Barclay)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION Relief from the Requirements of Local Civil Rule 7(n) by COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, MARY NEUMAYR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Samford, Barclay)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Barclay Samford on behalf of All Defendants (Samford, Barclay) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/16/2020) (ztd).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/29/2020. (lctjk1)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, MARY NEUMAYR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
September 24, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmd)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina R. Stella on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stella, Cristina)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ASSOCIATION OF IRRITATED RESIDENTS, INSTITUTE FOR AGRICULTURE AND TRADE POLICY, IOWA CITIZENS FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT, WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE, INC., WATERKEEPERS CHESAPEAKE (Waltz, Daniel)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7627338) filed by INSTITUTE FOR AGRICULTURE AND TRADE POLICY, ASSOCIATION OF IRRITATED RESIDENTS, ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, IOWA CITIZENS FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT, WATERKEEPERS CHESAPEAKE, WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons CEQ, #3 Summons Chairperson Neumayr, #4 Summons US Attorney for DC, #5 Summons Attorney General)(Waltz, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IOWA CITIZENS FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT et al v. COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOWA CITIZENS FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Represented By: Daniel H. Waltz
Represented By: Larissa Ursula Liebmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATION OF IRRITATED RESIDENTS
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Represented By: Daniel H. Waltz
Represented By: Larissa Ursula Liebmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Represented By: Daniel H. Waltz
Represented By: Larissa Ursula Liebmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INSTITUTE FOR AGRICULTURE AND TRADE POLICY
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Represented By: Daniel H. Waltz
Represented By: Larissa Ursula Liebmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE, INC.
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Represented By: Daniel H. Waltz
Represented By: Larissa Ursula Liebmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WATERKEEPERS CHESAPEAKE
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Represented By: Daniel H. Waltz
Represented By: Larissa Ursula Liebmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY
Represented By: Barclay Samford
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Neumayr
Represented By: Barclay Samford
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?