STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2020cv02731
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff's #3 Motion for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/22/2020. (lcabj1)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Green, Alexander)
September 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (Green, Alexander)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7635900) filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Green, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Richard Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?