AAYIOMAMITIS v. NATIONAL SPACE SOCIETY
Plaintiff: ANTHONY AYIOMAMITIS
Defendant: NATIONAL SPACE SOCIETY
Case Number: 1:2020cv02985
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00563. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties Stipulation Regarding Transfer of Venue and Withdrawal of Motion for Entry of Clerks Default, Doc. #12 , is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/14/2020. (KCB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION to transfer venue by Plaintiff Anthony Ayiomamitis. (Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 8/18/2020 (BRP). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Matthew T. Schelp for all further proceedings. (AAT) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Anthony Ayiomamitis. (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant National Space Society. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant National Space Society [ECF No. 8] is GRANTED and the default of said defendant is hereby entered. (EAB)(copy mailed to defendant on 8/7/2020 (EAB). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant National Space Society by Plaintiff Anthony Ayiomamitis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Certificate of Default)(Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 28, 2020 ***REMARK Per chambers request, sent email and left a voice message for attorney Richard Paul Liebowitz this day. (AAT) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff Anthony Ayiomamitis Order (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Anthony Ayiomamitis. National Space Society served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Liebowitz, Richard) (AAT). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m), that Plaintiff Anthony Ayiomamitis shall show cause in writing, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant National Space Society for lack of timely service. Show Cause Response due by 8/10/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 07/27/2020. (AAT) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Anthony Ayiomamitis to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 6/8/2020. (AAT) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Judge Baker enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/nannette-baker (EAB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Richard Paul Liebowitz. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (MFG) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (MFG) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Anthony Ayiomamitis Process Server: Same Day Process (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant National Space Society with receipt number AMOEDC-7876500, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Anthony Ayiomamitis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- the Photograph, #2 Exhibit B- Plaintiff's Website, #3 Exhibit C- Infringing Website, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form)(Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AAYIOMAMITIS v. NATIONAL SPACE SOCIETY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY AYIOMAMITIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL SPACE SOCIETY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?