BASTANI et al v. AFGE
Plaintiff: ELEANOR LAUDERDALE, ALEXANDER BASTANI and KEVIN MCCARRON
Defendant: AFGE
Case Number: 1:2020cv03061
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 7101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA by ALEXANDER BASTANI, ELEANOR LAUDERDALE, KEVIN MCCARRON #1 Complaint filed by KEVIN MCCARRON, ALEXANDER BASTANI, ELEANOR LAUDERDALE. (Jenkins, Eleanor) Modified on 11/6/2020 (zsb).
November 6, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #6 Errata was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. Filing is missing the signature. (zsb)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by ALEXANDER BASTANI, KEVIN MCCARRON, ELEANOR LAUDERDALE. (Attachments: #1 Errata)(Jenkins, Eleanor)
November 5, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #5 Complaint was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (adh, )
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/03/2020. (lcrdm1)
November 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ALEXANDER BASTANI, KEVIN MCCARRON, ELEANOR LAUDERDALE.(Jenkins, Eleanor)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by ALEXANDER BASTANI, KEVIN MCCARRON, ELEANOR LAUDERDALE filed by ALEXANDER BASTANI, KEVIN MCCARRON, ELEANOR LAUDERDALE.(Jenkins, Eleanor)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Bastani against All Defendants AFGE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7747641) filed by ALEXANDER BASTANI, KEVIN MCCARRON, ELEANOR LAUDERDALE. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Jenkins, Eleanor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BASTANI et al v. AFGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELEANOR LAUDERDALE
Represented By: Eleanor R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER BASTANI
Represented By: Eleanor R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN MCCARRON
Represented By: Eleanor R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?