HILL v. BOP DIRECTOR
Plaintiff: DEMETRIUS HILL
Defendant: BOP DIRECTOR
Case Number: 1:2020cv03141
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Receipt on 11/10/2020 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 1:20-cv-06689 sent by Northern District of Illinois. (zrdj)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED FORTHWITH to the USDC for the Northern District of Illinois. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 11/26/2020. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/6/2020. (adh, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Illinois, pursuant to the Court Order entered 11/6/2020. Sent to Court via Electronic. (adh, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DEMETRIUS HILL (adh, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DEMETRIUS HILL (adh, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOP DIRECTOR filed by DEMETRIUS HILL.(adh, )
October 23, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/23/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. BOP DIRECTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMETRIUS HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOP DIRECTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?