HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. et al v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
Plaintiff: HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. and HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CRIMINAL DIVISION, OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRADE REPRESENTATIVE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 1:2020cv03155
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRADE REPRESENTATIVE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY.(Powers, James)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 15, 2020. (lcrbw2)
December 10, 2020 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 11/9/2020; OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL served on 11/12/2020; OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 12/1/2020; OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRADE REPRESENTATIVE served on 11/9/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 11/9/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/9/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/9/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CRIMINAL DIVISION served on 11/9/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION served on 11/9/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS served on 11/9/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS served on 11/9/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL served on 11/9/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL served on 11/9/2020; U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 11/9/2020; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/9/2020; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY served on 12/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mailing - U.S. Department of Commerce, #2 Affidavit of Mailing - U.S. Department of Justice, Criminal Division, #3 Affidavit of Mailing - U.S. Department of Justice, Office of Legislative Affairs, #4 Affidavit of Mailing - U.S. Department of Justice, National Security Division, #5 Affidavit of Mailing - U.S. Department of Justice, Office of the Attorney General, #6 Affidavit of Mailing - U.S. Department of Justice, Office of the Deputy Attorney General, #7 Affidavit of Mailing - U.S. Department of Justice, Office of Public Affairs, #8 Affidavit of Mailing - U.S. Department of Justice, #9 Affidavit of Mailing - Office of Foreign Assets Control, #10 Affidavit of Mailing - U.S. Department of Homeland Security, #11 Affidavit of Mailing - U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, #12 Affidavit of Mailing - Office of Management and Budget, #13 Affidavit off Mailing - U.S. Department of State, #14 Affidavit of Mailing - United States Department of Treasury, #15 Affidavit of Mailing - Office of the United States Trade Representative)(Smith, Corinne)
December 10, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/09/2020. (Smith, Corinne)
December 10, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/5/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/5/2020. (Smith, Corinne)
December 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/21/2020, (hs)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #13 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before December 21, 2020, the defendants shall file their answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 9, 2020. (lcrbw2)
December 2, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRADE REPRESENTATIVE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, James)
November 5, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS (16) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRADE REPRESENTATIVE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE as to U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia filed by HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Smith, Corinne)
November 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tessa J.G. Roberts, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7781680. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tessa J.G. Roberts in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Corinne)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Olivia G. Hoffman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7781673. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Olivia G. Hoffman in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Corinne)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank R. Volpe on behalf of HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Volpe, Frank)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian J. Fischer, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7781638. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian J. Fischer in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Corinne)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Hay on behalf of HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Hay, Daniel)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Caitlin N. Matheny, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7781622. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Akowuah, Kwaku)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Smith, Corinne)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kwaku A. Akowuah on behalf of HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. (Akowuah, Kwaku)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRADE REPRESENTATIVE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7781283) filed by HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Civil Cover Sheet, #45 Summons, #46 Summons, #47 Summons, #48 Summons, #49 Summons, #50 Summons, #51 Summons, #52 Summons, #53 Summons, #54 Summons, #55 Summons, #56 Summons, #57 Summons, #58 Summons, #59 Summons, #60 Summons)(Smith, Corinne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. et al v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CRIMINAL DIVISION
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRADE REPRESENTATIVE
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.
Represented By: Kwaku A. Akowuah
Represented By: Frank R. Volpe
Represented By: Corinne M. Smith
Represented By: Daniel J. Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.
Represented By: Kwaku A. Akowuah
Represented By: Frank R. Volpe
Represented By: Corinne M. Smith
Represented By: Daniel J. Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?