HALL v. BARR et al
Plaintiff: Orlando Cordia Hall
Defendant: BARB VON BLANCKENSEE, T.J. WATSON, WILLIAM P. BARR, MICHAEL CARVAJAL and DONALD WASHINGTON
Case Number: 1:2020cv03184
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 30 MANDATE of USCA as to #25 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL ; USCA Case Number 20-5340. (Attachments: #1 USCA Judgment)(zrdj)
November 17, 2020 Filing 29 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #28 denying Order on Motion to Stay; USCA Case Number 20-05340. (zjf)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #27 Motion to Stay Execution Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/17/2020. (lcfb)
November 17, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal and for Stay Pending Disposition of Stay Motion by the D.C. Circuit by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL (Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 17, 2020 USCA Case Number 20-5340 for #25 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. (zrdj)
November 17, 2020 Filing 26 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #25 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zrdj)
November 17, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #24 Order, #23 Memorandum & Opinion by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-7843118. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Attachments: #1 November 16, 2020 Memorandum Opinion, #2 November 16, 2020 Order)(Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Consistent with #23 Memorandum Opinion, denying #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, denying #14 Emergency Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/16/2020. (lcfb)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; #14 Emergency Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/16/2020. (lcfb)
November 16, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE re #19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to the Record in Support of his Complaint and Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, MICHAEL CARVAJAL, BARB VON BLANCKENSEE, DONALD WASHINGTON, T.J. WATSON. (Walker, Johnny)
November 14, 2020 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (ztth)
November 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Supplement to the Record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/14/2020. (lcfb)
November 13, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to the Record in Support of his Complaint and Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ABA Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Indiana Executive Order 20-48, #3 Exhibit 3 - Chicago Emergency Travel Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - 7th Circuit Court of Appeals Order Regarding COVID-19, #5 Exhibit 5 - Breaking: As Lisa Montgomery's Execution Looms, Her Lawyers Have Contracted COVID-10, #6 Exhibit 6 - Washington Post Article Trump's Record-Breaking Spree of Federal Executions Could Come to an End Under Biden, #7 Exhibit 7 - Lawmakers Have 'Grave Concerns' Over How Officials are Handling COVID-19 Outbreak at N.J. Prison)(Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 12, 2020 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. (ztth)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/12/2020. (lcfb)
November 11, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Declaration in Support of Complaint and Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kelley J. Henry)(Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 11, 2020 Filing 17 ERRATA to Plaintiff Orlando Hall's Exhibit 5 in Support of Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL #1 Complaint,, filed by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 5 (attachment to Complaint))(Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 10, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to opposition to motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. (Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 11/9/2020. Reply due by 11/10/2020. (tb)
November 9, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in opposition to re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, MICHAEL CARVAJAL, BARB VON BLANCKENSEE, DONALD WASHINGTON, T.J. WATSON. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kira Gillespie, #2 Declaration of Tom Watson)(Walker, Johnny)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING MINUTE ORDER: Defendants shall file a response to #3 Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, not to exceed 20 pages, by 11/9/2020 at 1pm. Plaintiff may file a reply, not to exceed 10 pages, by 11/10/2020 at 1pm. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/6/2020. (lcfb)
November 5, 2020 Filing 14 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Golden, Kaitlyn). Added MOTION for Briefing Schedule on 11/12/2020 (znmw).
November 4, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to MICHAEL CARVAJAL, BARB VON BLANCKENSEE, DONALD WASHINGTON, T.J. WATSON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ORLANDO CORDIA HALL. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-145. (adh, )
November 4, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Judge Timothy J. Kelly is no longer assigned to the case. (adh, )
November 4, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Case Assigned/Reassigned was entered in error (adh, )
November 4, 2020 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, )
November 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Charles Moore, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7794285. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Orlando Cordia Hall (Ali, Kathryn)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Pieter Van Tol, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7794284. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Orlando Cordia Hall (Ali, Kathryn)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Victorson on behalf of Orlando Cordia Hall (Victorson, David) (Main Document 8 replaced on 11/4/2020) (ztth).
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Marshall Ali on behalf of Orlando Cordia Hall (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/4/2020) (ztth).
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert Owen, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7794281. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Orlando Cordia Hall (Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Marcia Widder, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7794279. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Orlando Cordia Hall (Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn Golden on behalf of Orlando Cordia Hall (Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Orlando Cordia Hall (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by Orlando Cordia Hall (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Golden, Kaitlyn)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7794272) filed by Orlando Cordia Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Related Case Form, #9 Exhibit 1, #10 Exhibit 2, #11 Exhibit 3, #12 Exhibit 4, #13 Exhibit 5, #14 Exhibit 6, #15 Exhibit 7, #16 Exhibit 8, #17 Exhibit 9, #18 Exhibit 10, #19 Exhibit 11, #20 Exhibit 12, #21 Exhibit 13, #22 Exhibit 14)(Golden, Kaitlyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HALL v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Cordia Hall
Represented By: Kaitlyn Golden
Represented By: David S. Victorson
Represented By: Kathryn Marshall Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARB VON BLANCKENSEE
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.J. WATSON
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CARVAJAL
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD WASHINGTON
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?