MCDANIEL v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Plaintiff: Tracy McDaniel
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Not Classified By Court: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 1:2020cv03266
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION with Jury Demand (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by TRACY MCDANIEL.(Weisbaum, Steven)
December 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Separate complaint due by 12/18/2020. (tb)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By 12/18/2020 Plaintiff shall file a copy of the Complaint as a separate ECF entry. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/15/2020. (DJS)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Mark Weisbaum on behalf of TRACY MCDANIEL (Weisbaum, Steven)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
November 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb)
November 17, 2020 Payment for #1 Notice of Removal,. ($400; Receipt number ADCDC-7845703). (McGrath, Felicity)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 ERRATA Correcting Filing Error by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION #1 Notice of Removal, filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (McGrath, Felicity)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (McGrath, Felicity)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 004265 B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1., #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2., #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3.)(McGrath, Felicity)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCDANIEL v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: Felicity Ann McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy McDaniel
Represented By: Steven Mark Weisbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Represented By: Felicity Ann McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?