JACKSON v. SAUL
Plaintiff: RAYMOND NORMAN JACKSON, JR.
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv03306
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Referring Judge: Robin M Meriweather
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 18, 2020 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for full case management. (zsb)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is hereby ORDERED, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.2, that this action is referred to a magistrate judge, to be randomly assigned by the Clerk's Office, for full case management up to and excluding trial. This includes, with respect to any potentially dispositive motion, the preparation of a report and recommendation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.3. It is further ORDERED that any future filings related to this matter shall have the initials of the presiding district judge and the assigned magistrate judge following the case number in the caption. The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 73.1, this action may be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, upon the filing of an executed notice of consent by all parties; consent of the presiding district judge is not necessary. The parties are hereby advised, however, that they may decline to consent to such a referral without adverse substantive consequences. Local Civil Rule 73.1(b). Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/18/2020. (lctjk1)
November 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by RAYMOND NORMAN JACKSON, JR re #1 Complaint, filed by RAYMOND NORMAN JACKSON, JR. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by RAYMOND NORMAN JACKSON, JR..(Wang, Alice)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7834046) filed by RAYMOND NORMAN JACKSON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons SSA Commission, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Wang, Alice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND NORMAN JACKSON, JR.
Represented By: Alice A Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?