JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Case Number: 1:2020cv03314
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Konkoly, Antonia)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by January 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/28/2020. (lctjk1)
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Konkoly, Antonia)
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Antonia Marie Konkoly on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Konkoly, Antonia)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 11/23/2020; OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 11/23/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 11/23/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 11/23/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/23/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/23/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 11/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/23/20. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/23/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Leigh Di Liberto on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Di Liberto, Meredith)
November 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:20-CV-01729. (Orfanedes, Paul)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7838212) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Orfanedes, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Antonia Marie Konkoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Represented By: Antonia Marie Konkoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Represented By: Antonia Marie Konkoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Represented By: Antonia Marie Konkoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Antonia Marie Konkoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Antonia Marie Konkoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Represented By: Antonia Marie Konkoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Represented By: Paul J. Orfanedes
Represented By: Meredith Leigh Di Liberto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?