ZELLER v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER : CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: William J Zeller, III and WILLIAM J. ZELLER, III
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation and NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 1:2020cv03326
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE Undecided Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Count II by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (Bassan, Andrew)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #8 Motion to Dismiss in light of the parties' #12 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/13/2021. (jag)
January 13, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Duckworth on behalf of WILLIAM J. ZELLER, III (Duckworth, James)
January 12, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Arising Under the Locomotive Inspection Act and the Federal Safety Appliance Act with Prejudice by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Bassan, Andrew)
January 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Star Singleton on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (Singleton, Dawn)
January 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Unopposed Motion by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) re #8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Pursuant to the Locomotive Inspection Act and the Federal Safety Appliance Act and Motion to Dismiss Count II for Failure to State a Claim (Bassan, Andrew)
January 12, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #9 Notice (Other), was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using their login/password by one of the signing attorneys on pleading. Filing submitted by counsel has not entered an appearance in this case. (Counsel should review LCvR5.4 & 83.2) (zjf)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Unopposed Motion by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) re #8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Pursuant to the Locomotive Inspection Act and the Federal Safety Appliance Act and Motion to Dismiss Count II for Failure to State a Claim (Hittinger, James) Modified on 1/12/2021 (zjf).
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Pursuant to the Locomotive Inspection Act and the Federal Safety Appliance Act and Motion to Dismiss Count II for Failure to State a Claim by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bassan, Andrew)
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (Bassan, Andrew)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK).(Bassan, Andrew)
December 23, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #5 Answer to Complaint was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using their assigned login/password (Signature must match login/password). (zjf)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK).(Singleton, Dawn) Modified on 12/23/2020 (zjf).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, nunc pro tunc. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 12/24/2020. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/11/2020. (jag)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bassan, Andrew)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020 (Bennett, Voci)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Corporation with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7840612) filed by William J Zeller, III. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bennett, Voci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZELLER v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER : CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J Zeller, III
Represented By: Voci R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM J. ZELLER, III
Represented By: Voci R. Bennett
Represented By: James M. Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: Andrew Bassan, I
Represented By: Dawn Star Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?