SILVA v. POMPEO et al
Plaintiff: RANDAL GANANSA SILVA
Defendant: MIKE POMPEO, JOHN C. LAW, KIMBERLY - KELLY, CHAD F. WOLF, WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI II, MARIK STRING, CHRISTOPHER ASHER WRAY and KIMBERLY C. KELLY
Case Number: 1:2020cv03352
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 2/2/2021. (ztg)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants' #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and DIRECTING defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint by February 2, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 15, 2021. (lcbah1)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI II, KIMBERLY C. KELLY, JOHN C. LAW, MIKE POMPEO, MARIK STRING, CHAD F. WOLF, CHRISTOPHER ASHER WRAY (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants (Goldstein, Joshua)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of All Defendants (Simon, Jeremy)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/20/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/19/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/24/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants (Goldstein, Joshua)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 24, 2020. (lcbah1)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI II, KIMBERLY - KELLY, JOHN C. LAW, MIKE POMPEO, MARIK STRING, CHAD F. WOLF, CHRISTOPHER ASHER WRAY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7853586) filed by RANDAL GANANSA SILVA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Goldstein, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SILVA v. POMPEO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE POMPEO
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN C. LAW
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY - KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F. WOLF
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM PELHAM BARR
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI II
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIK STRING
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER ASHER WRAY
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY C. KELLY
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDAL GANANSA SILVA
Represented By: Joshua L. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?