ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, ROBERT GILSTRAP, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC and TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, NINA B WITKOFSKY, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, WILLIAM P. BARR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2020cv03377
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 21-5093 for #55 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by NINA B WITKOFSKY, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, WILLIAM P. BARR, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (eg)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/12/2021 (zjch)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #54 Memorandum & Opinion, #53 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, (Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and Immediate Administrative Stay) by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the appeal was filed by the government re #55 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (eg)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #54 Memorandum & Opinion, #53 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, by WILLIAM P. BARR, ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, NINA B WITKOFSKY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ROBERT R. REDFIELD. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Vigen, Leslie)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the plaintiffs' #6 Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment and the defendants' #26 Motion for Summary Judgment and #32 Partial Motion to Dismiss. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 5, 2021. (lcdlf1)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying the defendants' #26 Motion for Summary Judgment and #32 Partial Motion to Dismiss, and granting the plaintiffs' #6 Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment. See text for details. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 5, 2021. (lcdlf1)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court is the defendants' #57 Emergency Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal of this Court's #53 May 5, 2021 Order vacating the national eviction moratorium at 86 Fed. Reg. 16,731. In this emergency motion, the defendants request an immediate administrative stay to give this Court time to consider and rule upon its motion to stay this case pending appeal. Alternatively, the defendants request that the Court stay its #53 May 5, 2021 Order as to all parties except for the plaintiffs. Defs.' Emergency Mot. for a Stay Pending Appeal at 1 n.1, 8-9, Dkt. 57. Although the plaintiffs have not yet filed an opposition to the defendants' motion, which was filed at 6:54 p.m. this evening, the defendants represent that the plaintiffs oppose the motion. Id. at 1 n.1. In order to give the Court time to consider the merits of the defendants' #57 Emergency Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal, and the plaintiffs time to file an opposition to the motion, the Court will grant the defendants' request for a temporary administrative stay. This Minute Order should not be construed in any way as a ruling on the merits of the defendants' motion. The Court notes, however, that, as the Court has explained, see Mem. Op. at 19, Dkt. 54, the law in this Circuit is clear: where a court concludes that an agency has exceeded its statutory authority, as this Court has done here, see Mem. Op. at 17, vacatur of the rule is the proper remedy in this Circuit. See Nat'l Mining Ass'n v. U.S. Army Corps of Eng'rs, 145 F.3d 1399, 1409 (D.C. Cir. 1998). Based on this clear authority, courts in this Circuit do not restrict vacatur only to those plaintiffs before the Court. See, e.g., O.A. v. Trump, 404 F. Supp. 3d 109, 152-53 (D.D.C. 2019). Indeed, the government has been unable to point to a single case in which a court in this Circuit has done so. See Mot. Hr'g Rough Tr. at 31. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Court's #53 May 5, 2021 Order is administratively STAYED. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall file any opposition to the defendants' motion on or before May 12, 2021, and the defendants shall file any reply within four days of the date the plaintiffs' opposition is filed. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 5, 2021. (lcdlf1)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich: Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2021 re #32 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by NINA B WITKOFSKY, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, WILLIAM P. BARR, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NINA B WITKOFSKY, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, WILLIAM P. BARR, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Court Reporter Sara Wick. (zjch)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 at 10:00 AM via video before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zjch)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Filing by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certification of Second Supplemental Administrative Record, #2 Supplement Index of Second Supplemental Administrative Record, #3 Supplement Supplement to Certified Administrative Record)(Vigen, Leslie)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2021 at 2:00 PM via video before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zjch)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE re #50 Notice (Other), of Extension and Supplemental Authority filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY. (Vigen, Leslie)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Extension and Supplemental Authority by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Extension of Eviction Moratorium, #2 Exhibit B - Sixth Circuit Order)(Shumate, Brett)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Imminent Extension of Eviction Moratorium by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shumate, Brett)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE re #47 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY, filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY. (Vigen, Leslie)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shumate, Brett)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY re #44 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY, filed by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Shumate, Brett)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE re #44 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY, filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY. (Vigen, Leslie)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shumate, Brett)
February 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPLY re #41 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY, filed by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Shumate, Brett)
February 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RESPONSE re #41 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY, filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY. (Myers, Steven)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Attachments: #1 Opinion and Order, #2 Judgment)(Shumate, Brett)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 JOINT APPENDIX by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Joint Appendix, #2 Joint Appendix Part 1, #3 Joint Appendix Part 2, #4 Joint Appendix Part 3)(Shumate, Brett)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Filing by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Supplemental Administrative Record, #2 Supplement Index of Supplemental Administrative Record)(Vigen, Leslie)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY to opposition to motion re #32 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY. (Vigen, Leslie)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Memorandum in opposition to re #32 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shumate, Brett)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Administrative Record due by 2/22/2021. Appendix due by 2/24/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2021. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2021. (zjch)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #36 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: the plaintiffs shall file a response to the defendants' partial motion to dismiss on or before February 15, 2021; the defendants shall file a reply in support of their partial motion to dismiss on or before February 22, 2021; the defendants shall file an updated certified list of the contents of the administrative record on or before February 22, 2021; and the plaintiffs shall file an appendix pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(n) on or before February 24, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 10, 2021. (lcdlf2)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Shumate, Brett)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Extension by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit January 29, 2021 CDC Order)(Vigen, Leslie)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Taylor on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Taylor, Charlotte)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiffs' #33 Consent Motion for a Temporary Stay, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The plaintiffs' deadline to respond to the defendants' #32 Partial Motion to Dismiss is STAYED. On or before February 8, 2021, the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court as to how they wish to proceed in this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 8, 2021. (lcdlf2)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/8/2021 (zjch)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Consent MOTION to Stay by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shumate, Brett)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vigen, Leslie)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to opposition to motion re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY. (Vigen, Leslie)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Congressional Action by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY (Vigen, Leslie)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Expedited) filed by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shumate, Brett)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Memorandum in opposition to re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shumate, Brett)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Expedited) filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY re #24 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Record Recertification & Updated Index)(Vigen, Leslie)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Record Certification & Index)(Vigen, Leslie)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NINA B WITKOFSKY served on 11/30/2020 (Shumate, Brett)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBERT R. REDFIELD served on 11/30/2020 (Shumate, Brett)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 11/30/2020 (Shumate, Brett)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/30/2020 (Shumate, Brett)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION served on 11/30/2020 (Shumate, Brett)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIAM P. BARR served on 11/30/2020 (Shumate, Brett)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 11/30/2020 (Shumate, Brett)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' #15 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule. Accordingly, the defendants shall provide the administrative record to the plaintiffs and file a certified list of its contents on or before December 11, 2020; the defendants shall file their opposition to the plaintiffs' expedited summary judgment motion and their cross-motion for summary judgment on or before December 21, 2020; the plaintiffs shall file any reply in support of their motion and their opposition to the defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment on or before December 28, 2020; and the defendants shall file any reply in support of their cross-motion on or before January 6, 2021. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants' obligation to answer shall be deferred to 30 days following resolution of the cross-motions, if the case remains pending. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 4, 2020. (lcdlf2)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Myers on behalf of All Defendants (Myers, Steven)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vigen, Leslie)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Cooper Vigen on behalf of All Defendants (Vigen, Leslie)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Expedited) Amended Certificate of Service. (Shumate, Brett)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Lacy Owen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lacy Owen, Megan) (Main Document 12 replaced on 11/24/2020) (zeg). (Main Document 12 replaced on 11/24/2020) (zeg).
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Autumn Hamit Patterson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Patterson, Autumn) (Main Document 11 replaced on 11/24/2020) (zeg).
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 23, 2020. (lcdlf2)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, WILLIAM P. BARR, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NINA B WITKOFSKY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Autumn Hamit Patterson. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 23, 2020. (lcdlf2)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Megan Lacy Owen. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 23, 2020. (lcdlf2)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Autumn Hamit Patterson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7862993. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Autumn Hamit Patterson, #2 Proposed Order)(Shumate, Brett)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Megan Lacy Owen, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7862927. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Megan Lacy Owen, #2 Proposed Order)(Shumate, Brett)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Expedited) by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Fordham Declaration, #3 Declaration Gilstrap Declaration, #4 Declaration Cororaton Declaration, #5 Declaration Walker Declaration, #6 Declaration Junkin Declaration, #7 Proposed Order)(Shumate, Brett)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Shumate, Brett)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC (Shumate, Brett)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC (Shumate, Brett)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, DANNY FORDHAM, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, ROBERT GILSTRAP, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-3702-WMR (N.D. Ga.); 2:20-cv-02692-MSN-atc (W.D. Tenn.); 6:20-cv-00564 (E.D. Tex.); 5:20-cv-02407-JRA (N.D. Ohio). (Shumate, Brett)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7861856) filed by ROBERT GILSTRAP, FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC, TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC, DANNY FORDHAM, ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shumate, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NINA B WITKOFSKY
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT R. REDFIELD
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALABAMA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Represented By: Megan Lacy Owen
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Charlotte Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Represented By: Megan Lacy Owen
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Charlotte Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.E. CAUTHEN LAND AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Represented By: Megan Lacy Owen
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Charlotte Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT GILSTRAP
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Represented By: Megan Lacy Owen
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Charlotte Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNY FORDHAM
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Represented By: Megan Lacy Owen
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Charlotte Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORDHAM & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Represented By: Megan Lacy Owen
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Charlotte Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TITLE ONE MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Represented By: Megan Lacy Owen
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Charlotte Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?